Okolie v. City of Seattle et al
Plaintiff: Edmund Okolie
Defendant: City of Seattle, Seattle Police Department, Lindsay Brown, David Bauer, Michael Silvagni, Balawa James, Roger Russnes and Seattle City Mayor
Case Number: 2:2017cv01531
Filed: October 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 32 Defendant City of Seattle's Motion for Summary Judgment. All of Plaintiff's remaining claims are DISMISSED. All other pending motions are STRICKEN as MOOT. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (cc:plaintiff via USPS)(LW)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER re: Plaintiff's 27 Memo. The Court does not interpret Plaintiff's Memo as a motion. Plaintiff's filing appears related to discovery and does not clearly request any relief from the Court. The Memo appears to indicate that a motion to compel is forthcoming. The Court is unclear as to the intent or utility of the filing, does not treat it as a motion, and will disregard it. Authorized by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) cc: Plaintiff via first class mail
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 21 Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM) cc: plaintiff via first class mail
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER striking Plaintiff's 19 Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint. Authorized by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM) cc: plaintiff via first class mail
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting Defendant City of Seattle's 10 Motion re: Plaintiff's Case Obligations and Enforcing Prior Orders and Response to January 12 Order to Show Cause. No later than March 2, 2018, Plaintiff and counsel for the City shall meet in person at a time and place that the parties mutually agree on to conduct the conference that Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) requires; Joint Status report due no later than 3/21/2018. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(TH) (cc: Plaintiff via U.S. mail)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Okolie v. City of Seattle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edmund Okolie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Seattle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seattle Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsay Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Silvagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Balawa James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Russnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seattle City Mayor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?