Uniloc USA, Inc et al v. HTC America, Inc
Plaintiff: Uniloc USA Inc and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.
Defendant: HTC America Inc
Case Number: 2:2017cv01558
Filed: October 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER directing parties to file a Joint Status Report within ten days of entry of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting Defendant's 62 Unopposed Motion to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review. It is therefore ORDERED that this case is stayed pending resolution (either by final written decision or appeal thereof) of Patent Trial and Appeal Boar d matters. Defendant must file a status report within 90 days of the date of this order and every 90 days until the Court lifts the stay. If the case is resolved or there is any significant development at any time during one of the 90-day periods, HTC America must file a status report regarding the development within 5 days of its occurrence. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re: Discovery Materials. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Setting Telephonic Conference. The court ORDERS the parties to file separate statements further explaining the nature of the dispute, setting forth the applicable legal standard, and providing brief argument in support of their positions. The parties must file their statements no later than Wednesday, July 11, 2018, at 12:00 p.m. The court further ORDERS the parties to appear for a telephonic conference on Thursday, July 12, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting Defendant HTC America, Inc.'s 33 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting Defendant HTC America Inc.'s 32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases . All future pleadings filed in this matter shall bear the cause number C17-1558JLR. The court further ORDERS that its previously entered scheduling order (Dkt. # 28 ) governs this consolidated matter. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER to Consolidate Cases. Cases C17-1558JLR, C17-1561JLR and C17-1562JLR are consolidated. All future pleadings filed in this matter shall bear the case number C17-1558JLR. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending deadline until 2/9/2018 for Defendant HTC America, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uniloc USA, Inc et al v. HTC America, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uniloc USA Inc
Represented By: David E. Crowe
Represented By: James John Foster(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Aaron Seth Jacobs(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Al Van Kampen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.
Represented By: David E. Crowe
Represented By: James John Foster(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Aaron Seth Jacobs(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Al Van Kampen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?