Temperate Paradise Properties, LLC v. M/V DOG'S HOUSE et al
Plaintiff: Temperate Paradise Properties, LLC
Defendant: M/V DOG'S HOUSE and Gordon Myers
Case Number: 2:2017cv01582
Filed: October 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER. The Court indefinitely stayed the arrest of M/V Dog's House, Official Vessel No. 1266706 in November 2017. (Dkt. No. 14 .) The underlying action was subsequently dismissed without prejudice. (Dkt. No. 21 .) The case is now CLOSED. The Court therefore now QUASHES the outstanding warrant and DIRECTS the U.S. Marshal Service to CLOSE this case. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) (cc: USMO)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER dismissing action without prejudice per 20 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Clerk is directed to strike all pending motions and close this case. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff's notice of pending settlement (Dkt. No. 18 ). Plaintiff is instructed to file either a stipulated order of dismissal or submit briefing to the Court to show cause why the current arrest warrant should not be quashed, by Friday, December 8, 2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff adequately pleads admiralty jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1333, Rule C of the Supplemental Rules for Admiralty or Maritime Claims and Asset Forfeiture Actions. Therefore, Defendants motion to challenge jurisdiction is DEN IED. Defendant claims an interest in the property at issue and objects to arrest of M/V Dog's House, Official Vessel No. 1266706. (Dkt. No. 13 ) He is entitled to be heard. LAR 116. Plaintiff is therefore DIRECTED to file a written response to Defendant's objection by Wednesday, November 22, 2017 showing why an order vacating the arrest should not be granted. Plaintiff's response shall not exceed 12 pages. Defendant is DIRECTED to file a reply by Monday, November 27, 2017. Defend ant's reply must not exceed six pages. Oral argument will not be taken. The Court will rule based on the filings. Arrest of M/V Dog's House, Official Vessel No. 1266706 is STAYED until the Court rules on Defendant's objection. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) (cc: Defendant Gordon Myers via U.S. Mail)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER re Defendant's 11 Motion to Stay Arrest of Vessel; the arrest of M/V Dog's House, Official Vessel No. 1266706 (Dkt. No. 7 ) is stayed until November 23, 2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT) (cc: Defendant via USPS, USMO via hand delivery)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 5 Motion to Appoint Substitute Custodian and for Authority to Move Vessel. Signed by Judge James L. Robart.(TH) (Order hand delivered to USMO)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Temperate Paradise Properties, LLC v. M/V DOG'S HOUSE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Temperate Paradise Properties, LLC
Represented By: Robert Shawn Griggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V DOG'S HOUSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?