Spens v. Life Insurance Company Of North America
Plaintiff: Dawn Spens
Defendant: Life Insurance Company Of North America
Case Number: 2:2017cv01592
Filed: October 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1002
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 17 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal. This stipulation is self-executing, and this action is DISMISSED with prejudice and without an award of costs or attorney fees to either party. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 11 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file her amended complaint within ten (10) days of the issuance of this order. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 7 Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer Complaint; deadline for Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America to respond to Plaintiff's complaint is EXTENDED to December 18, 2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spens v. Life Insurance Company Of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Spens
Represented By: Aaron Isak Engle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company Of North America
Represented By: Charles C Huber
Represented By: D Michael Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?