Tavares v. Alabama Housing Finance Authority
Plaintiff: Christine Tavares
Defendant: Alabama Housing Finance Authority
Case Number: 2:2017cv01599
Filed: October 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Skagit
Presiding Judge: Marsha J. Pechman
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 24 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Having found that the outcome of this case could conceivably have an effect on an estate being administered in bankruptcy, the Court REFERS this case to the Bankruptcy Court for all pre-trial proceedings. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: bankruptcy court
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER ON EXTENSION OF DEADLINES re: 22 Stipulated Motion. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 2/6/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/13/2018, Joint Status Report due by 2/20/2018. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 6 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and denying Defendant's 12 Motion for Additional Time to respond. As a condition of granting the temporary restraining order, the Court orders Plaintiff to pay the Clerk of Court $2,302.66 monthly, due on the fifteenth (15) day of each month, pending resolution of this action on the merits. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: finance
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to defendant why it should be granted additional time to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order in a brief of no more than five (5) pages due November 17, 2017 with Plaintiff's response due November 20, 2017. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tavares v. Alabama Housing Finance Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Tavares
Represented By: Arthur E Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Housing Finance Authority
Represented By: Kimberly Hood
Represented By: Craig Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?