Schmitt v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington et al
Plaintiff: Andrea Schmitt and Elizabeth Mohundro
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington Options, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Northwest, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc and Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington Options, Inc
Case Number: 2:2017cv01611
Filed: October 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Filing 49 OPINION OF USCA (NOT THE MANDATE 18-35846) as to #46 Notice of Appeal, filed by Andrea Schmitt, Elizabeth Mohundro. AFFIRMED in part, REVERSED in part, and REMANDED. (SG)
October 16, 2018 Filing 48 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Plaintiffs Elizabeth Mohundro, Andrea Schmitt for proceedings held on 08/02/2018, re #38 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript,,,. Requesting Attorney: Eleanor Hamburger. (Hamburger, Eleanor)
October 12, 2018 Filing 47 TIME SCHEDULE ORDER (18-35846) as to #46 Notice of Appeal, filed by Andrea Schmitt, Elizabeth Mohundro (SG)
October 11, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE OF APPEAL to Ninth Circuit (18-35846) re #43 Judgment by Court, #42 Order on Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Elizabeth Mohundro, Andrea Schmitt. Filing Fee $505, Receipt number 0981-5504752. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Order and Judgment)(Hamburger, Eleanor) Modified on 10/11/2018 to add filing fee information from #44 Notice of Appeal (GMR). Modified on 10/15/2018 ADD CCA #(SG).
October 11, 2018 Filing 45 REPRESENTATION STATEMENT, by Plaintiffs Elizabeth Mohundro, Andrea Schmitt, (re: #44 Notice of Appeal,.) (Hamburger, Eleanor)
October 11, 2018 Filing 44 DISREGARD - RE-FILED AS #46 NOTICE OF APPEAL Notice of Appeal to Ninth Circuit re #43 Judgment by Court, #42 Order on Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Elizabeth Mohundro, Andrea Schmitt. Filing Fee $505, Receipt number 0981-5504752. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, Order and Judgment)(Hamburger, Eleanor) Modified on 10/11/2018 (GMR).
October 11, 2018 ***NOTICE TO PARTIES: Please disregard #44 Notice of Appeal, filed by Andrea Schmitt, Elizabeth Mohundro, as the Notice of Appeal was refiled as #46 Notice of Appeal. (cc: USCA) (GMR)
September 14, 2018 Filing 43 JUDGMENT BY COURT in favor of Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington Options, Inc, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Northwest, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc against Andrea Schmitt, Elizabeth Mohundro (KERR)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting defendants' #17 Motion to Dismiss, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
August 30, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #24 Praecipe to Attach Document, #22 Response to Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Elizabeth Mohundro, Andrea Schmitt (Attachments: #1 Supplement Ramos v. Nielsen, #2 Supplement Ismail v. Amazon.com)(Hamburger, Eleanor)
August 30, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #17 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington Options, Inc, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Northwest, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Bailey, Mark)
August 28, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #17 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington Options, Inc, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Northwest, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Bailey, Mark)
August 27, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 8/2/2018 before Judge Robert S. Lasnik.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Andrea Ramirez, andrea_ramirez@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8509. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/26/2018, (AR)
August 2, 2018 Filing 37 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Robert S. Lasnik- Dep Clerk: Kerry Simonds; Pla Counsel: Eleanor Hamburger, Richard Spoonemore; Def Counsel: Medora Marisseau; CR: Andrea Ramirez; Time of Hearing: 1:30 p.m.; Courtroom: 15106; Motion Hearing held on 8/2/2018 re #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington Options, Inc, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Northwest, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. After hearing the arguments of counsel, the Court takes this matter under advisement. An Order shall issue. (KERR)
August 2, 2018 Filing 36 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Re: Case Scheduling Order by parties re #32 Minute Order Setting Trial Date and Related Dates,, (Hamburger, Eleanor)
July 31, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #17 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington Options, Inc, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Northwest, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Bailey, Mark)
July 31, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #24 Praecipe to Attach Document, #22 Response to Motion by Plaintiffs Elizabeth Mohundro, Andrea Schmitt (Attachments: #1 Flack v. Wis. Dept. of Health Servs., #2 Boyden v. Conlin)(Hamburger, Eleanor)
June 27, 2018 Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER Setting Hearing on #17 MOTION to Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2018 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 15106 before Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 AMENDED ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: 6 days. Bench Trial is set for 6/3/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 15106 before Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Motion for Class Certification due by 9/10/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 10/10/2018, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 12/9/2018, Discovery completed by 2/7/2019, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 1/22/2019, Dispositive motions due by 3/9/2019, Motions in Limine due by 4/18/2019, Pretrial Order due by 5/6/2019, Trial briefs and trial exhibits to be submitted by 6/2/2019, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
May 8, 2018 NOTE re Document #31 . Appearance of attorney J Derek Little is not proper, and notices of electronic filing will not be sent until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. (SWT)
May 8, 2018 Filing 31 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER RE: CASE SCHEDULING ORDER by parties re #14 Minute Order Setting Trial Date and Related Dates,, (Hamburger, Eleanor)
April 25, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Medora A Marisseau for Defendants Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington Options, Inc, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Northwest, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc from 5/28/18-6/15/18. (Marisseau, Medora)
February 28, 2018 Filing 29 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT (Class Action) against defendant(s) Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington Options, Inc, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Northwest, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc Attorney Eleanor Hamburger added to party Elizabeth Mohundro(pty:pla), filed by Andrea Schmitt, Elizabeth Mohundro.(Hamburger, Eleanor)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting plaintiff's #20 Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) Counsel is directed to e-file their Amended Complaint.
February 16, 2018 Filing 27 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Andrea Schmitt, TO RESPONSE to #20 Second MOTION to Amend Complaint (Hamburger, Eleanor)
February 13, 2018 Filing 26 RESPONSE, by Defendants Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington Options, Inc, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Northwest, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc, to #20 Second MOTION to Amend Complaint. (Bailey, Mark)
February 9, 2018 Filing 25 REPLY, filed by Defendants Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington Options, Inc, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Northwest, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc, TO RESPONSE to #17 MOTION to Dismiss (Marisseau, Medora)
February 5, 2018 Filing 24 PRAECIPE to attach document re #22 Response to Motion by Plaintiff Andrea Schmitt (Attachments: #1 replacement of #22)(Hamburger, Eleanor)
February 5, 2018 Filing 23 DISREGARD THIS FILING- filed in error per counsel. Correctly filed as #24 [PRAECIPE to attach document (replacement of #22) re #22 Response to Motion by Plaintiff Andrea Schmitt (Hamburger, Eleanor) Modified on 2/5/2018 (PS).
February 5, 2018 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #23 Praecipe to Attach Document : DISREGARD THIS FILING- filed in error per counsel. Correctly filed as #24 (PS)
February 2, 2018 Filing 22 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Andrea Schmitt, to #17 MOTION to Dismiss . (Hamburger, Eleanor)
February 1, 2018 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Eleanor Hamburger filed by Plaintiff Andrea Schmitt re #20 Second MOTION to Amend Complaint (Hamburger, Eleanor)
February 1, 2018 Filing 20 Second MOTION to Amend Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Andrea Schmitt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Second Amended Complaint (Class Action), #2 Proposed Order Granting Pl Leave to File 2d Amended Complaint) Noting Date 2/16/2018, (Hamburger, Eleanor)
January 5, 2018 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Natalie Bell filed by Defendants Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington Options, Inc, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Northwest, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc re #17 MOTION to Dismiss (Marisseau, Medora)
January 5, 2018 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Medora A. Marisseau filed by Defendants Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington Options, Inc, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Northwest, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc re #17 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Marisseau, Medora)
January 5, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendants Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington Options, Inc, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Northwest, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Citation Notice of Unpublished Opinions) Noting Date 2/9/2018, (Marisseau, Medora)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re parties' #15 Stipulation, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
January 3, 2018 Filing 15 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order by parties (Hamburger, Eleanor)
December 14, 2017 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: 6 days. Bench Trial is set for 3/4/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 15106 before Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Joinder of Parties due by 1/11/2018, Motion for Class Certification due 6/7/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 7/7/2018, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 9/5/2018, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 10/19/2018, Discovery completed by 11/4/2018, Dispositive motions due by 12/4/2018, Motions in Limine due by 1/13/2019, Pretrial Order due by 1/31/2019, Trial briefs and trial exhibits to be submitted by 2/27/2019 (KERR)
December 13, 2017 Filing 13 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 6. (Hamburger, Eleanor)
December 12, 2017 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT (CLASS ACTION) against defendant(s) Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington Options, Inc, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Northwest, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc, filed by Andrea Schmitt.(Hamburger, Eleanor)
December 11, 2017 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Northwest for Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc; Corporate Parent Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington for Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington Options, Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington Options, Inc, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Northwest, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc (Marisseau, Medora)
November 30, 2017 Attorney Mark A Bailey added for Defendants Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington Options, Inc, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Northwest, and Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. per #3 Notice of Appearance. (PM)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Answer Deadline and Regarding Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss re parties' #9 Stipulated Motion; Defendants shall file an Answer, or otherwise responsive pleading, by 1/5/2018. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
November 21, 2017 Filing 9 Stipulated MOTION Extending Answer Deadline and Re Briefing Schedule, filed by Defendants Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington Options, Inc, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Northwest, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. Noting Date 11/21/2017, (Marisseau, Medora)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 12/13/2017, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
November 13, 2017 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Caroline Little, Customer Service Representative, Corporation Service Company, Register Agent for Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. on 11/2/2017, filed by Plaintiff Andrea Schmitt. (Hamburger, Eleanor)
November 13, 2017 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Caroline Little, Customer Service Representative, Corporation Service Company, Register Agent for Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Northwest on 11/2/2017, filed by Plaintiff Andrea Schmitt. (Hamburger, Eleanor)
November 13, 2017 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Ann Wicker, VP for DWT Washington, LLC, registered agent for Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington Options, Inc. on 11/1/2017, filed by Plaintiff Andrea Schmitt. (Hamburger, Eleanor)
November 13, 2017 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Ann Wicker, VP for DWT Washington, LLC, registered agent for Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington on 11/1/2017, filed by Plaintiff Andrea Schmitt. (Hamburger, Eleanor)
November 3, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Medora A Marisseau on behalf of Defendants Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington Options, Inc, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Northwest, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (Marisseau, Medora)
October 31, 2017 Filing 2 Summons(es) electronically issued as to defendant(s) Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington Options, Inc, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Northwest, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(DJ)
October 31, 2017 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (DJ)
October 30, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Class Action) against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5071119) Attorney Eleanor Hamburger added to party Andrea Schmitt(pty:pla), filed by Andrea Schmitt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington, #3 Summons to Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington Options, Inc., #4 Summons to Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Northwest, #5 Summons to Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.)(Hamburger, Eleanor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schmitt v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Schmitt
Represented By: Richard E Spoonemore
Represented By: Eleanor Hamburger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Mohundro
Represented By: Richard E Spoonemore
Represented By: Eleanor Hamburger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington Options, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Northwest
Represented By: Mark A Bailey
Represented By: Medora A Marisseau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington
Represented By: Mark A Bailey
Represented By: Medora A Marisseau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc
Represented By: Mark A Bailey
Represented By: Medora A Marisseau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington Options, Inc
Represented By: Mark A Bailey
Represented By: Medora A Marisseau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?