Ferguson v. Waid

Plaintiff: Sandra L Ferguson
Defendant: Brian J Waid
Counter_claimant: Brian J Waid
Counter_defendant: Sandra L Ferguson
Case Number: 2:2017cv01685
Filed: November 9, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2018 188 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Imposing Rule 11 Sanctions Against Attorney John Muenster. Mr. Muenster shall file documentation within thirty (30) days of this Order certifying payment. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SWT)
November 30, 2018 186 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RULE 11 VIOLATIONS BY JOHN MUENSTER re: 184 Declaration of Emily Rose. Show Cause Response due within seven (7) days. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
November 19, 2018 179 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW)
November 2, 2018 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part, denying in part and deferring in part 147 , 149 Motions in Limine. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SWT)
October 17, 2018 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 117 Second Motion for Summary Judgment on Defamation Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SWT)
September 26, 2018 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to retrieve cashier's check from the Clerk's Office in Seattle no later than tomorrow and deliver these funds to Defendant immediately. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SWT)
September 24, 2018 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding Plaintiff Sandra Ferguson in contempt of Court. Plaintiff Ferguson is ORDERED to pay sanctions of $100 per day, starting from the date of this Order, payable to Defendant Brian Waid, until such time she complies with the Court� 39;s previous Orders to pay Rule 11 sanctions at Dkts. # 70 and # 115 . Plaintiff's counsel, Mr. Muenster, shall show cause why his conduct described above has not violated Rule 11(b). This response must be filed within fourteen (14) days and may not exceed six (6) pages. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
September 21, 2018 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 125 Motion for Relief from a Deadline and to Issue a Subpoena. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
September 11, 2018 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant's 122 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Plaintiff's Response to Show Cause Order is due no later than fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
August 13, 2018 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 109 Motion to Reset the Trial as a Jury Trial; directing the clerk to issue an amended scheduling order, signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SWT)
August 6, 2018 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part Defendants' 104 Motion for Entry of Final Judgment. Ms. Ferguson shall pay Defendants $39,399 in attorney's fees and $79 in costs as a sanction under Rule 11(c) no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. All other requested relief is DENIED. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (TH)
July 16, 2018 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 98 Motion to Reset Discovery Completion Date. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
June 19, 2018 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER striking Plaintiff's 95 Motion to Compel and all attachments. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
June 12, 2018 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 71 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendant Brian J. Waid's Civil Harassment Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
May 30, 2018 93 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER Striking Robert Gould's 92 Objections to Subpoena as procedurally improper signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH) (cc: non-party Robert Gould via first class mail)
May 25, 2018 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 90 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
May 11, 2018 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying parties' Motions for Partial Summary Judgment on Defamation Claim (Dkts. # 58 and # 77 ). Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
April 9, 2018 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part Defendant Brian J. Waid's 45 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff Ferguson shall pay Defendant $39,399 in attorney's fees and $79 in costs as a sanction under Rule 11(c). Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
March 28, 2018 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 56 Motion for Leave to File Over-Length Brief. The Court will entertain no further motions for over-length briefing from Ms. Ferguson. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
March 26, 2018 54 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER striking the following documents: 42 , 43 , 48 , 49 , 50 , 51 , and 52 . Defendant need not respond to Ms. Ferguson's 42 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by the previous noting date. If Ms. Ferguson chooses to proceed with this Motion, she must refile according to the procedures in this order. Authorized by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
March 13, 2018 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant's 25 Motion for Sanctions. Plaintiff shall pay $10,000 to Defendant as a fee imposed under RCW 4.24.510. Defendant to file separate motion for reasonable fees and costs incurred in this case no later than ten (10) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
March 9, 2018 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant's 16 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED with prejudice. This case remains open. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
February 20, 2018 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant's 31 Motion for Leave to Amend His Counterclaims to Withdraw the Malicious Prosecution Counterclaim Pursuant to FRCP 15. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
January 29, 2018 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 30 Second Motion for Reconsideration signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
January 23, 2018 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 27 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
January 12, 2018 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part Plaintiff's 17 Motion for Relief from Deadline; directing Clerk to RENOTE defendants' 16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings : Noting Date 1/26/2018, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferguson v. Waid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian J Waid
Represented By: Jeffrey Edward Bilanko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra L Ferguson
Represented By: Sandra L Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Brian J Waid
Represented By: Jeffrey Edward Bilanko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Sandra L Ferguson
Represented By: Sandra L Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?