United States of America v. Northwest Trustee Services Inc

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Northwest Trustee Services Inc
Case Number: 2:2017cv01686
Filed: November 9, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 50a:533 Servicemembers Civil Relief Act - mortgages
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2018 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending STAY and vacating trial date and related deadlines re parties' 49 Joint Status. Parties shall either file a voluntary dismissal of this action or a joint status report within 14 days of the Superior Court's ruling on settlement agreement. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
October 4, 2018 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE. Voluntary dismissal of this action or Joint Status Report due by 11/7/2018, by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
July 9, 2018 42 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER re parties' 41 Joint Status Report. The Court orders the parties to submit a third joint status report when they perfect their settlement or no later than 30 days of the date of this order, whichever occurs first. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
April 30, 2018 37 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER setting oral argument on Defendant's 26 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint, and Defendant's 23 MOTION to Quash. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge James L. Robart. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
February 7, 2018 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
January 16, 2018 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Stipulated Motion extending for one week the deadline to file the Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Northwest Trustee Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: J. Michael Diaz
Represented By: Alan Martinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Trustee Services Inc
Represented By: Janaya Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?