Bailey-Medwell v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Carol Bailey-Medwell
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2017cv01697
Filed: November 10, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Marsha J. Pechman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 11, 2018 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER re 24 Opposition and Cross Motion. Defendants are directed to re-file its Opposition and Cross-Motion no later than June 14, 2018. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
May 14, 2018 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER granting modified briefing schedule on cross motions for summary judgment. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment and all supporting materials is due May 21, 2018; Defendant's opposition and cross motion for summary judgment with all supporting materials is due June 8, 2018; Plaintiff's deadline to file her response is 6/25/2018; Defendant' deadline to file its response is 7/9/2018. The parties' cross-motions for summary judgment to be noticed for July 13, 2018. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
November 22, 2017 11 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED MOTION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT re parties' 9 Stipulated Motion. The deadline for Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company to file responsive documents to the complaint is EXTENDED to December 8, 2017. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (TH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey-Medwell v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Bailey-Medwell
Represented By: Robert B Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: D Michael Reilly
Represented By: Douglas A Scullion(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Anna Shiran Youssefi(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?