Hystad v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: James Alf Hystad
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2017cv01702
Filed: November 12, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2018 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Reversing and Remanding the Case for Further Administrative Proceedings signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (TH)
March 28, 2018 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Sanctions signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (TH)
March 19, 2018 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing Plaintiff to show cause why this matter should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Show Cause Response due by 3/22/2018. Signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (PM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hystad v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Alf Hystad
Represented By: Donna Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?