Jewish Family Service of Seattle et al v. Trump et al

Plaintiff: Jewish Family Service of Seattle, Jewish Family Services of Silicon Valley, Allen Vaught, Afkab Mohamed Hussein, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 3, Jane Doe 4, Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 6 and John Doe 7
Defendant: Donald Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Elaine Duke, U.S. Department of State, Rex W Tillerson, Office of the Director of National Intelligence and Daniel Coats
Amicus: Amici Curiae, Muslim Advocates, The Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center, Advocates for Youth, Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Judge David L Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, Mississippi Center for Justice, National Center for Lesbian Rights, People for the American Way Foundation, Southern Coalition for Social Justice and Washington Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights and Urban Affairs
Case Number: 2:2017cv01707
Filed: November 13, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 29, 2017 72 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER re C17-0178JLR and C17-1707: Pursuant to the parties' stipulations, these cases are hereby consolidated. All future pleadings or other filings in either action shall be filed in Case No. C17-0178JLR. All future pleadings or other filings in the consolidated case shall identify in the caption whether the pleading or filing pertains to one or both of the cases. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
November 28, 2017 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Doe Plaintiffs' 4 Motion proceed under pseudonym. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
November 27, 2017 67 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFFS' 42 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants' opposition due 12/7/2017; Plaintiffs' reply due 12/13/2017. The Clerk is directed to renote the motion 42 to 12/13/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
November 21, 2017 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING CONSOLIDATION re related action of Doe, et al., v. Trump, et al., C17-0178JLR. Plaintiffs and Defendants to file separate memorandum no later than 11/29/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jewish Family Service of Seattle et al v. Trump et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jewish Family Service of Seattle
Represented By: Lauren E Aguiar(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Deepa Alagesan(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: David J. Burman
Represented By: Justin B. Cox(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Abigail E. Davis(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Linda Evarts(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mark J. Hetfield(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mariko Hirose(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mollie M Kornreich(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kathryn C. Meyer(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Tyler S. Roberts
Represented By: Lauren Watts Staniar
Represented By: Esther Sung(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Elizabeth G Sweet(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jewish Family Services of Silicon Valley
Represented By: Lauren E Aguiar(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Deepa Alagesan(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: David J. Burman
Represented By: Justin B. Cox(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Abigail E. Davis(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Linda Evarts(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mark J. Hetfield(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mariko Hirose(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mollie M Kornreich(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kathryn C. Meyer(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Tyler S. Roberts
Represented By: Lauren Watts Staniar
Represented By: Esther Sung(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Elizabeth G Sweet(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Vaught
Represented By: Lauren E Aguiar(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Deepa Alagesan(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: David J. Burman
Represented By: Justin B. Cox(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Abigail E. Davis(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Linda Evarts(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mark J. Hetfield(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mariko Hirose(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mollie M Kornreich(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kathryn C. Meyer(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Tyler S. Roberts
Represented By: Lauren Watts Staniar
Represented By: Esther Sung(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Elizabeth G Sweet(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Afkab Mohamed Hussein
Represented By: Lauren E Aguiar(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Deepa Alagesan(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: David J. Burman
Represented By: Justin B. Cox(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Abigail E. Davis(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Linda Evarts(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mark J. Hetfield(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mariko Hirose(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mollie M Kornreich(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kathryn C. Meyer(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Tyler S. Roberts
Represented By: Lauren Watts Staniar
Represented By: Esther Sung(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Elizabeth G Sweet(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 1
Represented By: Lauren E Aguiar(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Deepa Alagesan(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: David J. Burman
Represented By: Justin B. Cox(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Abigail E. Davis(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Linda Evarts(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mark J. Hetfield(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mariko Hirose(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mollie M Kornreich(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kathryn C. Meyer(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Tyler S. Roberts
Represented By: Lauren Watts Staniar
Represented By: Esther Sung(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Elizabeth G Sweet(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 2
Represented By: Lauren E Aguiar(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Deepa Alagesan(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: David J. Burman
Represented By: Justin B. Cox(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Abigail E. Davis(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Linda Evarts(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mark J. Hetfield(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mariko Hirose(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mollie M Kornreich(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kathryn C. Meyer(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Tyler S. Roberts
Represented By: Lauren Watts Staniar
Represented By: Esther Sung(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Elizabeth G Sweet(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 3
Represented By: Lauren E Aguiar(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Deepa Alagesan(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: David J. Burman
Represented By: Justin B. Cox(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Abigail E. Davis(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Linda Evarts(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mark J. Hetfield(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mariko Hirose(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mollie M Kornreich(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kathryn C. Meyer(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Tyler S. Roberts
Represented By: Lauren Watts Staniar
Represented By: Esther Sung(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Elizabeth G Sweet(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 4
Represented By: Lauren E Aguiar(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Deepa Alagesan(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: David J. Burman
Represented By: Justin B. Cox(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Abigail E. Davis(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Linda Evarts(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mark J. Hetfield(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mariko Hirose(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mollie M Kornreich(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kathryn C. Meyer(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Tyler S. Roberts
Represented By: Lauren Watts Staniar
Represented By: Esther Sung(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Elizabeth G Sweet(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 5
Represented By: Lauren E Aguiar(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Deepa Alagesan(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: David J. Burman
Represented By: Justin B. Cox(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Abigail E. Davis(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Linda Evarts(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mark J. Hetfield(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mariko Hirose(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mollie M Kornreich(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kathryn C. Meyer(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Tyler S. Roberts
Represented By: Lauren Watts Staniar
Represented By: Esther Sung(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Elizabeth G Sweet(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 6
Represented By: Lauren E Aguiar(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Deepa Alagesan(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: David J. Burman
Represented By: Justin B. Cox(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Abigail E. Davis(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Linda Evarts(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mark J. Hetfield(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mariko Hirose(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mollie M Kornreich(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kathryn C. Meyer(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Tyler S. Roberts
Represented By: Lauren Watts Staniar
Represented By: Esther Sung(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Elizabeth G Sweet(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 7
Represented By: Lauren E Aguiar(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Deepa Alagesan(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: David J. Burman
Represented By: Justin B. Cox(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Abigail E. Davis(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Linda Evarts(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mark J. Hetfield(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mariko Hirose(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mollie M Kornreich(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kathryn C. Meyer(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Tyler S. Roberts
Represented By: Lauren Watts Staniar
Represented By: Esther Sung(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Elizabeth G Sweet(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Trump
Represented By: Joseph Dugan
Represented By: Kevin Snell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Joseph Dugan
Represented By: Kevin Snell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine Duke
Represented By: Joseph Dugan
Represented By: Kevin Snell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of State
Represented By: Joseph Dugan
Represented By: Kevin Snell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rex W Tillerson
Represented By: Joseph Dugan
Represented By: Kevin Snell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Director of National Intelligence
Represented By: Joseph Dugan
Represented By: Kevin Snell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Coats
Represented By: Joseph Dugan
Represented By: Kevin Snell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Amici Curiae
Represented By: Michael C Subit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Muslim Advocates
Represented By: Amir Ali(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Matthew W Callahan(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Joseph P. Hoag
Represented By: Aziz Huq(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Johnathan J Smith(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: The Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center
Represented By: Joseph P. Hoag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Advocates for Youth
Represented By: Michael C Subit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
Represented By: Michael C Subit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Judge David L Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law
Represented By: Michael C Subit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Mississippi Center for Justice
Represented By: Michael C Subit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: National Center for Lesbian Rights
Represented By: Michael C Subit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: People for the American Way Foundation
Represented By: Michael C Subit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Southern Coalition for Social Justice
Represented By: Michael C Subit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Washington Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights and Urban Affairs
Represented By: Michael C Subit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?