February 6, 2020 |
Filing
82
ORDER REGARDING ADMISSIBILITY OF EVIDENCE AT TRIAL re parties' 81 Stipulated Motion. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
|
December 6, 2019 |
Filing
69
ORDER denying Plaintiff's 68 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
|
November 21, 2019 |
Filing
66
ORDER RE: EVIDENTIARY HEARING REGARDING SIMILAR INCIDENTS re: Dkt. ## 49 51 61 63 65 . The Court hereby finds and ORDERS that Arendt Incidents 1, 3, 5, and 8 are admissible for the reasons stated in this order. The remaining incidents cited by Plaintiffs are excluded under FRE 403. Evidence of emotional pain and suffering from survivors of similar incidents is excluded under FRE 403. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
|
October 2, 2019 |
Filing
59
MINUTE ORDER. This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. The Honorable John C. Coughenour, United States District Judge, hereby RECUSES himself from this case. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
|
October 1, 2019 |
Filing
58
MINUTE ORDER. On October 1, 2019, the Court held a chambers conference with the parties' counsel to disclose a potential conflict because Judge Coughenour owns a 2014 Honda CR-V. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
|
September 30, 2019 |
Filing
57
MINUTE ORDER granting 56 Stipulated Motion to Extend Deposition Dates and to Strike Motion. Rodent expert depositions shall take place no later than October 22, 2019. Defendants' motion to exclude the late-disclosed supplemental report of Plaintiff's rodent expert (Dkt. No. 42 ) is STRUCK. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
|
September 13, 2019 |
Filing
48
MINUTE ORDER re: parties' 41 proposed briefing schedule for the October 1, 2019 pretrial evidentiary hearing. The parties' briefs for the evidentiary hearing shall be filed no later than September 24, 2019. The parties may file post-hearing briefs no later than October 8, 2019. Authorized U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
|
July 19, 2019 |
Filing
40
MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 39 Stipulated Motion for a Hearing. The Court hereby schedules an evidentiary hearing for 10/1/2019 at 9:00 a.m. No later than 8/2/2019, the parties shall file a proposed briefing schedule regarding the content and scope of the pretrial hearing. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
|
March 21, 2019 |
Filing
36
MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 35 Stipulated Motion to reset the trial date. Deadline for Defendants to depose Plaintiff's rebuttal expert is 9/5/2019; Deadline for Defendants to disclose rebuttal experts is 9/20/2019; Deadline f or Plaintiff to depose rebuttal experts is 10/5/2019; Pretrial Order due by 10/21/2019; Trial briefs to be submitted by 10/25/2019; Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 10/25/2019; Jury Trial is set for 11/4/2019 at 9:30 AM. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
|
March 14, 2019 |
Filing
34
ORDER denying Defendants' 28 Motion to Exclude. The trial, currently scheduled for April 22, 2019, is hereby VACATED. The parties shall meet and confer to select a new trial date that is no later than 10/31/2019. No later than 3/20/2019, the parties shall file a motion notifying the Court of their jointly proposed trial date(s). Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
|
February 6, 2019 |
Filing
27
MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 26 Stipulated Motion re Confidential Information authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
|
December 26, 2018 |
Filing
25
MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 24 Stipulated Motion to Extend Certain Pretrial Deadlines. Plaintiff's Rebuttal Expert Disclosures deadline is 1/18/2019; Defendants' Rebuttal Expert Disclosures deadline is 2/18/2019; 39.1 mediation to be completed by 2/28/2019; Discovery completed by 2/28/2019. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
|
August 3, 2018 |
Filing
23
MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 22 Amended Stipulated Motion to Set Expert Disclosure Deadlines. Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures (FRCP 26(a)(2)) deadline is 10/26/2018; Defendants' Expert Disclosures (FRCP 26(a)(2)) deadline is 11/27/2018; Plaintiff's Rebuttal Expert Disclosures deadline is 1/4/2019; Defendants' Rebuttal Expert Disclosures deadline is 2/4/2019. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
|
July 27, 2018 |
Filing
21
MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 20 Stipulated Amended Motion to set expert witness disclosure deadlines. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 9/24/2018, Defendants' Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due 10/24/2018; Defendants' Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 10/24/2018; Plaintiff's Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 11/26/2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
|
July 13, 2018 |
Filing
19
MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 18 Stipulated Motion to Set Expert Witness Disclosure Deadlines: Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures due by 9/24/2018, Defendants' Expert Witness Disclosure due by 10/24/2018, Plaintiff's Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 10/24/2018, Defendants' Rebuttal Expert Disclosure due by 11/26/2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
|
December 27, 2017 |
Filing
12
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re parties' 11 Stipulated MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
|