Caldwell v. The Boeing Company et al
Plaintiff: Brett Caldwell
Defendant: The Boeing Company and Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2017cv01741
Filed: November 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting Defendant's 75 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Bill of Costs: Defendant shall file its Bill of Costs no later than 5/15/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart.(MW)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting Defendant The Boeing Company's 47 Motion for Summary Judgment on all of Plaintiff Brett Caldwell's remaining claims. Signed by Judge James L. Robart.(SWT)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Trial re parties' 69 Stipulated Motion: Jury Trial is continued to 6/1/2020 at 01:30 PM. The Court will issue a new scheduling order for the remaining pretrial deadlines. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER denying parties' 65 Joint Motion to Modify Court's Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER extending deadlines re parties' 43 Stipulated Motion: Expert Discovery completed by 3/8/2019, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 11/28/2018, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 1/11/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER re: parties' 41 Stipulated Motion. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 11/14/2018, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 12/14/2018. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARING CONFIDENTIALITY OF DISCOVERY MATERIAL re: parties' 36 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 33 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Third Amended Complaint. The deadline for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint is extended to June 19, 2018. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 25 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. The court GRANTS Mr. Caldwell leave to amend his second amended complaint to correct the deficiencies described herein within 14 days of the filing date of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re: Plaintiff's 29 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Reba Weiss is substituted for attorney Lauren D Parris Watts as counsel for Plaintiff Brett Caldwell. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. Clerk's note: attorney admission clerk contacted to update Ms. Parris Watts' address. (PM)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying as moot Defendant Boeing's 19 Motion to Dismiss the original complaint. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 16 Stipulated Motion extending deadline for Defendant to respond to complaint. Deadlines for any motion to dismiss that Defendant Boeing may file is as follows: Deadline to answer, move or otherwise respond to complaint is 1/12/2018; opposition to any motion to dismiss due 12/12/2018, reply to motion due 2/23/2018. Noting date for any motion to dismiss filed by Boeing is 2/23/2018. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting 8 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. The deadline for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to December 29, 2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?