Leopona, Inc. et al v. UK Cycling Events, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Leopona, Inc., Don't Be A Lout Music, LLC, Lionheart Media, LLC, Benjamin Allen, Michel Aubinais, Laura Ault, Victoriah Banuelos, Hannah Gabriela Banuelos, Phillip Brasenell, Randall Crissman, David V. Debiak, Brian V. Dekker, Randa L Dekker, Julien Garnier, Julien Gaulier, Grant Geertsma, Hywel Griffiths, James Henderson, Ari Herstand, Robin Jackson, Mark Jorgenson, Cary D. Judd, Edward Kadane, Murray William Lewis, Shay Magro, Nathan Mathes, Nathan Miller, Tomo Nakayama, Cory Nelson, Mike Regan, Rob Schaeffer, Kyle Schonewell, Kris Schonewell, Mark Son, Alan Thomas, Mark Ullrich, Alessandra Rose Whitford, Erik Widman, Kent Widman, Dustin Wise and Gebhardt John Zurburg
Defendant: UK Cycling Events, Ltd., Gareth Roelofse and Jon Gilbert
Case Number: 2:2017cv01765
Filed: November 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting parties' 39 Stipulated Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice. This case is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice, and without an award of attorney's fees or costs to any party. This case may be reopened for the purpose of enforcing the Parties' Settlement Agreement, should enforcement be necessary. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (TH)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying Defendants' 19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Stipulated Motion to extend deadlines. Response to complaint due 4/9/2018; FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 4/16/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/23/2018, Joint Status Report due by 4/30/2018. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting defendants' 12 Motion to Extend Defendants' Deadline to Respond to Complaint and to Continue the Initial Disclosures and Joint Status Report Deadlines in ECF No. 11; deadline to respond to complaint extended to 3/8/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/22/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/29/2018, Joint Status Report due by 3/15/2018, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(SWT)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 10 Stipulated Motion Extending Defendants' Deadline to Respond to Complaint. Response to Complaint due 1/22/2018; Joint Status Report due by 1/29/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 2/5/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/12/2018. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leopona, Inc. et al v. UK Cycling Events, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leopona, Inc.
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don't Be A Lout Music, LLC
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lionheart Media, LLC
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Allen
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michel Aubinais
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Ault
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoriah Banuelos
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Gabriela Banuelos
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Brasenell
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Crissman
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David V. Debiak
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian V. Dekker
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randa L Dekker
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julien Garnier
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julien Gaulier
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grant Geertsma
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hywel Griffiths
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Henderson
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ari Herstand
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Jackson
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Jorgenson
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cary D. Judd
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Kadane
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murray William Lewis
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shay Magro
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Mathes
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Miller
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomo Nakayama
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Nelson
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Regan
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rob Schaeffer
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Schonewell
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kris Schonewell
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Son
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Thomas
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Ullrich
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alessandra Rose Whitford
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Widman
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Widman
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Wise
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gebhardt John Zurburg
Represented By: Ana M. Popp
Represented By: Stephen P VanDerhoef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UK Cycling Events, Ltd.
Represented By: Kathyleen A O'Brien(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Theresa Wang
Represented By: Carla M Wirtschafter(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gareth Roelofse
Represented By: Kathyleen A O'Brien(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Theresa Wang
Represented By: Carla M Wirtschafter(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Gilbert
Represented By: Kathyleen A O'Brien(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Theresa Wang
Represented By: Carla M Wirtschafter(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?