MUFG Union Bank, NA v. Tyler et al
Plaintiff: MUFG Union Bank, NA
Defendant: Aaron Tyler, John Fogliani, Jessica Allis, Heidi Brindle, Bianca Mack, Wendy McKenzie, Micaela Meza, Darrick Cox and U.S. Bank
Case Number: 2:2017cv01766
Filed: November 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 18:1836
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing all claims with prejudice and without attorneys' fees re parties' 87 Stipulation, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SWT)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting Defendants' 81 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's CFAA claim against them will be dismissed in its entirety with prejudice. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 62 63 Motions to Dismiss. Any amended complaint to be filed within 20 days this order. Plaintiff's First, Second and Fourth Claims for Relief are DISMISSED with prejudice. Plaintiff's Third and Fifth Claims for trade misappropriation under state and federal law will proceed at this time. Defendant U.S. Bank's 71 Motion to Stay Discovery is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting Defendants' 17 Motion for Leave to File Over-Length Brief in Opposition to Union Bank's 5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: Plaintiff's 5 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Judge Martinez will hold a hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, on Thursday, December 7, 2017, at 2:00 p.m., at which time Defendants will be asked to Show Cause why a preliminary injunction should not issue. Any supplemental response to motion due at 5:00 p.m. on 12/5/2017; Reply due at 12:00 p.m. on 12/6/2017. Signed by Judge Richard A Jones on behalf of Chief Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MUFG Union Bank, NA v. Tyler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MUFG Union Bank, NA
Represented By: Clarence M Belnavis
Represented By: Alexander Archer Wheatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Tyler
Represented By: Duffy J Graham
Represented By: Stephen C Willey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Fogliani
Represented By: Duffy J Graham
Represented By: Stephen C Willey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Allis
Represented By: Duffy J Graham
Represented By: Stephen C Willey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Brindle
Represented By: Duffy J Graham
Represented By: Stephen C Willey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bianca Mack
Represented By: Duffy J Graham
Represented By: Stephen C Willey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy McKenzie
Represented By: Duffy J Graham
Represented By: Stephen C Willey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micaela Meza
Represented By: Duffy J Graham
Represented By: Stephen C Willey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrick Cox
Represented By: Duffy J Graham
Represented By: Stephen C Willey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank
Represented By: Aaron D Goldstein
Represented By: Edward B Magarian(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?