Farzad v. Snohomish County Superior Court et al

Petitioner: Said Farzad
Respondent: Snohomish County Superior Court, Robert W Ferguson and Mark Roe
Case Number: 2:2017cv01805
Filed: December 1, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: Marsha J. Pechman
Referring Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 3, 2018 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 27 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; Modifying Case Caption; and granting Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SWT)(Robert W Ferguson and Mark Roe terminated.) (cc: Snohomish County Superior Court via USPS)
March 8, 2018 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Petitioner's 19 Motion to Stay. The Snohomish County Superior Court is hereby enjoined from proceeding to sentence or judgment in Case No. 14-1-01917-8 until further notice from this Court. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: Judge Tsuchida
March 7, 2018 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Petitioner's 23 Motion to allow late filing of Reply to Respondent's Answer to the 19 Motion for Temporary Stay. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (PM)
December 4, 2017 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (AE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farzad v. Snohomish County Superior Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Said Farzad
Represented By: Jesse Guerrero Cantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Snohomish County Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert W Ferguson
Represented By: John Joseph Samson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mark Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?