Securities and Exchange Commission v. MacCord, Jr et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Donald E MacCord, Jr, Shannon D Doyle and Digi Outdoor Media, Inc
Case Number: 2:2017cv01809
Filed: December 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTE ORDER: The parties are DIRECTED to show cause, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Minute Order, why this case should not be dismissed either with or without prejudice. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW) (cc: Defendant MacCord via USPS to AL and CA addresses)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MINUTE ORDER: The stay imposed by the Minute Order entered March 5, 2018, docket no. 23 , shall remain in full force and effect. The parties shall file another Joint Status Report within twenty-one (21) days after Mr. Doyle is sentenced in the r elated criminal proceeding or by December 31, 2021, whichever is earlier. A draft of such Joint Status Report shall be mailed to defendant pro se Donald MacCord at least one (1) week before the deadline for submission. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW) (cc: Defendant Donald MacCord via USPS)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the Joint Status Report, docket no. 54 , filed by plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission and defendants Shannon D. Doyle and Digi Outdoor Media, Inc., the stay imposed by the Minute Order entered 3/5/2018, docket no. 23 , shall remain in full force and effect. The parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before 1/4/2021. A draft of such Joint Status Report shall be mailed to defendant pro se Donald MacCord at least three (3) weeks before the deadline for submission. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW) (cc: Defendant MacCord jr via USPS)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the Joint Status Report, docket no. 52 , filed by plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission and defendants Shannon D. Doyle and Digi Outdoor Media, Inc., the stay imposed by the Minute Order entered 3/5/2018, docket no. 23 , shall remain in full force and effect. The parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before 10/30/2020. A draft of such Joint Status Report shall be mailed to defendant pro se Donald MacCord at least three (3) weeks before the deadline for submission. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW) (cc: Defendant Donald MacCord via USPS on 9/15/2020)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the Joint Status Report, docket no. 50 , filed by plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission and defendants Shannon D. Doyle and Digi Outdoor Media, Inc., the stay imposed by the Minute Order entered 3/5/2018, docket n o. 23 , shall remain in full force and effect. The parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before 8/31/2020. A draft of such Joint Status Report shall be mailed to defendant pro se Donald MacCord at least three (3) weeks before the deadline for submission. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW)(cc: Defendant Donald MacCord via USPS)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the Joint Status Report, docket no. 48 , filed by plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission and defendants Shannon D. Doyle and Digi Outdoor Media, Inc., the stay imposed by the Minute Order entered 3/5/2018, docket n o. 23 , shall remain in full force and effect. The parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before 5/1/2020. A draft of such Joint Status Report shall be mailed to defendant Donald MacCord at least three (3) weeks before the deadline for submission. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW) (cc: Defendant Donald MacCord via USPS)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MINUTE ORDER. Defendant MacCord is deemed as proceeding pro se in this action. Pursuant to 46 Joint Status Report, the stay imposed by 23 Minute Order shall remain in full force and effect. Parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before 2/14/2020. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Defendant Donald MacCord) Clerk's Note: Defendant MacCord's address updated on the docket. (
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER extending deadline by which a notice of appearance must be filed by an attorney representing defendant Donald E. MacCord, Jr. to 5/15/2019. The stay imposed by 23 Minute Order shall remain in full force and effect. Joint Status Report due by 9/30/2019. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Defendant Donald E. MacCord at all 3 addresses via USPS) Modified docket text on 4/8/2019 (SWT).
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER directing the stay imposed by 23 Minute Order, remain in full force and effect; parties to file Joint Status Report by 4/5/2019. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendant Donald E. MacCord, Jr.'s 14 Motion to Stay which is joined by defendant Shannon D. Doyle, Dkt. No. 16 . A Status Conference is set for 5/4/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Authorized signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. MacCord, Jr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Jason M. Habermeyer
Represented By: Justin Myer Lichterman
Represented By: Robert L. Tashjian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald E MacCord, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon D Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digi Outdoor Media, Inc
Represented By: Colin M George
Represented By: Spencer Hall, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?