Oppong v. Sessions et al

Petitioner: Alfred Oppong
Respondent: Jefferson Sessions, Elaine Duke, Bryan S. Wilcox, Warden and U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 2:2017cv01810
Filed: December 4, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Referring Judge: James P. Donohue
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL adopting the 15] Report and Recommendation. The parties' 14 stipulated motion to dismiss is granted. Respondents' 7 motion to dismiss is denied as moot. This action is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
March 27, 2018 15 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION signed by James P. Donohue re 7 MOTION to Dismiss and 14 Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss. Noting Date is 3/27/2018,. (Attachments: # 1 R&R Proposed Order, # 2 R&R Proposed Judgment)(PM)
February 6, 2018 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time. Respondents' 7 MOTION to Dismiss is RE-NOTED for 3/30/2018. Petitioner's response due 3/26/2018; Reply due by noting date. Signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. (PM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oppong v. Sessions et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alfred Oppong
Represented By: Corey Endo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jefferson Sessions
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Elaine Duke
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bryan S. Wilcox
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?