Delgado v. Tarabochia et al

Plaintiff: Daniel Terre Delgado
Defendant: Mark Tarabochia, Tarabochia, Inc and F/V Joyce Marie
Case Number: 2:2017cv01822
Filed: December 5, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2018 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 23 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Exchange Expert Disclosures. IT IS ORDERED that expert disclosures are now due on August 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH)
May 4, 2018 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part plaintiff's 15 Motion to Quash Subpoenas Issued by Defendants, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
March 1, 2018 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating 8 Order to Show Cause, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
February 9, 2018 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why sanctions including dismissal should not be imposed for failure to comply with 6 Order; Show Cause Response and Joint Status Report due by 2/23/2018, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delgado v. Tarabochia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Terre Delgado
Represented By: Mark Choate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Tarabochia
Represented By: Joseph M Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tarabochia, Inc
Represented By: Joseph M Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F/V Joyce Marie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?