Maxill Inc. v. Loops, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Maxill Inc.
Defendant: Loops, LLC and Loops Flexbrush LLC.
Case Number: 2:2017cv01825
Filed: December 5, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: Whatcom
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2018 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DEADLINES. Length of trial: 5 days; Jury Trial is set for 1/27/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15206 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Statement of asserted claims and preliminary infringement contentions due 9/12/2018, Statement of preliminary invalidity contentions due 10/12/2018, Opening claim construction briefs due 3/11/2019, Responsive claim construction briefs due 3/26/2019, Discovery completed by 8/1/2019, Dispositive motions due by 10/3/2019, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 5/24/2019, Joint claim chart due 1/15/2019, Reports from expert witnesses regarding Markman issues due 1/15/2019, Rebuttal expert reports regarding Markman issues due 2/14/2019, Motions due by 7/3/2019, Motions in Limine due by 12/26/2019, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 6/24/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 1/17/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Pretrial Order due by 1/10/2020, Trial briefs and Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 1/10/2020. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
August 17, 2018 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER directing the Clerk to disregard plaintiff Maxill Inc.'s 18 Praecipe. The caption of this case shall remain as indicated. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
July 30, 2018 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting parties' stipulated motion to consolidate cases (Dkt. 15 , in C17-1825 TSZ). C17-1825 TSZ and C18-1026 TSZ are hereby CONSOLIDATED for all purposes. All future pleadings, motions, briefs, and other papers shall be filed only in Case No. C17-1825 TSZ. Attorney Kent M. Walker, who has appeared as counsel of record for Loops, LLC and Loops Flexbrush, LLC in C17-1825 TSZ, need not file another application to proceed pro hac vice with respect to C18-1026 TSZ. Attor ney Karthik Nadesan must file a pro hac vice application in C17-1825 TSZ within 14 days if Mr. Nadesan wishes to continue as counsel of record for Loops, LLC and Loops Flexbrush. Similarly, if counsel representing Maxill Inc. in Utah will participate in this matter following its transfer, they must file appropriate applications to proceed pro hac vice. The 7/30/2018 Deadline for a Joint Status Report is stricken. Parties to file a revised Joint Status Report within 21 days of this Minute Order. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM) cc: Karthik Nadesan, Kimberly Neville, Bryon J. Benevento via ECF ad hoc by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
March 22, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER staying this matter pending resolution of Bob Barker Company, Inc.'s and Maxill Inc.'s motions to dismiss the complaint in the Utah case. Within fourteen (14) days after resolution or by 7/30/2018 the parties shall file an updated Joint Status Report. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maxill Inc. v. Loops, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxill Inc.
Represented By: Boyoon Choi
Represented By: Mudit Kakar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loops, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loops Flexbrush LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?