Fox v. Aetna Inc.

Plaintiff: Jody Fox
Defendant: Aetna Inc
Case Number: 2:2017cv01832
Filed: December 6, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: San Juan
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2018 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 19 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time. The parties are instructed to file a stipulated notice of dismissal or otherwise update the Court on settlement progress by 6/15/2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
April 26, 2018 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER re parties' 17 Notice of Settlement. The parties shall file a stipulated notice of dismissal within 30 days of the issuance of this order. All pending deadlines in this case are hereby STRICKEN, including the status conference currently set for May 1, 2018 at 9:00 am (Dkt. No. 16 ). Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
March 8, 2018 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 11 Stipulated Motion to Continue March 20, 2018 Status Conference. The status conference is CONTINUED to April 17, 2018 at 9:00 am. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
February 14, 2018 7 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 6 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to the complaint is hereby EXTENDED from February 14, 2018 to February 28, 2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fox v. Aetna Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody Fox
Represented By: Christie J Fix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?