Kim v. Sanofi Pasteur, Inc

Plaintiff: John Kim
Defendant: Sanofi Pasteur, Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv00031
Filed: January 9, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2018 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendant's 18 Motion for Sanctions; granting in part, deferring in part and denying in part plaintiff's 30 Motion to Compel Production. Within seven (7) days of the date of this Minute Order, defendant shall provide for in camera review, two hardcopy emails in dispute. The oral argument scheduled for 11/20/2018, at 10:00 a.m. is STRICKEN. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
October 24, 2018 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting parties' 34 Stipulated MOTION to Reschedule Oral Argument on 30 MOTION to Compel Production of Unredacted Documents or for In Camera Review. The Motion Hearing is rescheduled from 11/15/2018 to 11/20/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
October 15, 2018 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER deferring and RENOTING defendant's 18 Motion for Sanctions: Noting Date 10/26/2018 ; SETTING Oral Argument for 11/15/2018 at 10:00 AM on defendant's 18 Motion for Sanctions, and plaintiff's 30 Motion to Compel ; granting parties' 29 Stipulated Motion as follows: Jury Trial is set for 9/9/2019; Length of Trial - 5 days. Motions due by 3/14/2019, Discovery completed by 4/19/2019, Dispositive motions due by 5/16/2019, Daubert motions d ue by 5/23/2019, Motions in Limine due by 8/8/2019, Pretrial Order due by 8/16/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 8/30/2019 at 01:30 PM. Trial briefs to be submitted by 8/16/2019, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 8/16/2019. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
May 25, 2018 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information re parties' 16 Stipulation, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
April 5, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER pursuant to parties' 13 Stipulation; directing Clerk to modify docket to reflect that defendant's name is "Sanofi Pasteur Inc.," not "Sanofi Pasteur, Inc.," and all future papers filed in this matter shall include the correct caption. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
March 22, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re parties' 9 Stipulation, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kim v. Sanofi Pasteur, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Kim
Represented By: Tiffany Mae Cartwright
Represented By: Leslie J Hagin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi Pasteur, Inc
Represented By: Michael Anthony Griffin
Represented By: Jonathan M. Minear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?