Baker v. Laborer's Local 440 et al

Plaintiff: Nathen Baker
Defendant: Laborer's Local 440, Muckleshoot Tribe Construction Department, Mid Mountain Contractors Inc and Muckleshoot Casino
Case Number: 2:2018cv00034
Filed: January 9, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Marsha J. Pechman
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Overpayment and Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 31:3545
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2018 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL for failure to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: plaintiff via first class mail
January 16, 2018 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, by no later than 1/30/2018, why this complaint should not be dismissed as untimely; failure to file an amended complaint by 1/30/2018 will result in dismissal. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
January 12, 2018 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (PM) cc: plaintiff via first class mail

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Laborer's Local 440 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathen Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laborer's Local 440
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muckleshoot Tribe Construction Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid Mountain Contractors Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muckleshoot Casino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?