Huhn v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Ronald Roy Huhn, Jr.
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill and Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2018cv00057
Filed: January 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEY'S FEES PURSUANT TO THE EQUAL ACCESS TO JUSTICE ACT, 28 U.S.C. 2412(d) signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida, re: #16 Motion for Attorney Fees. (TF)
September 10, 2018 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Edward A. Wicklund, Esq. filed by Plaintiff Ronald Roy Huhn, Jr re #16 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A All Professional Time, #2 Exhibit B Attorney Time, #3 Exhibit C Paralegal Time, #4 Exhibit D Expenses, #5 Exhibit E Costs, #6 Exhibit F Affirmation and Waiver of Direct Payment of EAJA Fees, #7 Memorandum in Support, #8 Certificate of Service)(Wicklund, Edward)
September 10, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412, filed by Plaintiff Ronald Roy Huhn, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/28/2018, (Wicklund, Edward)
June 12, 2018 Filing 15 JUDGMENT BY COURT; The Commissioner's final decision is REVERSED and the case is REMANDED for further administrative proceedings under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g). (AE)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REVERSING THE COMMISSIONER'S FINAL DECISION AND REMANDING FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (AE)
June 4, 2018 Filing 13 REPLY BRIEF by Plaintiff Ronald Roy Huhn, Jr. (Wicklund, Edward)
May 16, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSIVE BRIEF re #11 Brief - Opening by Defendant Nancy A Berryhill. (Andsager, Diana)
April 23, 2018 Filing 11 OPENING BRIEF in Support of a Social Security Appeal by Plaintiff Ronald Roy Huhn, Jr (Wicklund, Edward)
April 3, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Diana Andsager on behalf of Defendant Nancy A Berryhill. (Andsager, Diana)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Plaintiff's Opening Brief due by 4/23/2018, Defendant's Responsive Brief due by 5/21/2018, Plaintiff's Optional Reply Brief due by 6/4/2018. (KMP)
March 26, 2018 Filing 8 SEALED SOCIAL SECURITY CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD-ANSWER filed by Defendant Nancy A Berryhill. (Attachments: #1 002 Court Transcript Index, #2 003 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, #3 004 Payment Documents and Decisions, #4 005 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, #5 006 Non Disability Related Development, #6 007 Disability Related Development, #7 008 Medical Records Part 1, #8 009 Medical Records Part 2)(Mishalanie, Nancy)
March 6, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Nancy A Mishalanie on behalf of Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Mishalanie, Nancy)
February 6, 2018 Filing 6 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Nancy A. Berryhill on 2/6/2018 (Wicklund, Edward)
January 18, 2018 Filing 5 CONSENT by all parties to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Case remains assigned to Hon. Brian A. Tsuchida. (AE)
January 18, 2018 Filing 4 Summons(es) electronically issued as to defendant(s) Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(RE)
January 18, 2018 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (RE)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #2 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Edward A Wicklund for Plaintiff Ronald Roy Huhn, Jr., by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
January 16, 2018 Filing 2 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Edward A. Wicklund FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Ronald Roy Huhn, Jr. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5163165 (Bam, Maren)
January 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Nancy A. Berryhill (Receipt # 0981-5163160) Attorney Maren A. Bam added to party Ronald Roy Huhn, Jr.(pty:pla), filed by Ronald Roy Huhn, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Bam, Maren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huhn v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Roy Huhn, Jr.
Represented By: Maren A. Bam
Represented By: Edward A Wicklund
Represented By: Maren A Bam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Represented By: Diana Andsager
Represented By: Nancy A Mishalanie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?