Baker v. Gates et al
Plaintiff: Dr. Nathen Baker and Nathen Dwayne Baker
Defendant: William H. Gates, Mike Pence, Paul G. Allen, Microsoft Corporation and Microsoft Investors Relation
Case Number: 2:2018cv00059
Filed: January 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2021 Filing 7 LETTER to the Court filed by Nathen Dwayne Baker. (address updated per envelope) (MW)
March 26, 2018 Filing 6 JUDGMENT BY COURT. Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED without prejudice. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via first class mail)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ADOPTING #4 Report and Recommendation. This action is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
February 26, 2018 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Objections to R&R due by 3/19/2018, Noting Date 3/23/2018, by Hon. James P. Donohue. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Judgment) (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via first class mail)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is GRANTED LEAVE TO AMEND his IFP and shall have 30 days from the date of this Order to correct the deficiencies. Signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via U.S. Mail)
January 16, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Donohue, filed by Nathen Baker. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(DJ) Modified on 1/18/2018 (DJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Gates et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William H. Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Pence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul G. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Investors Relation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Nathen Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathen Dwayne Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?