Spesock et al v. U.S. Bank NA et al

Plaintiff: Jeffrey Spesock and Janet Spesock
Defendant: U.S. Bank, NA, Bank of America, NA, LaSalle Bank, NA and Residential Funding Company, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00092
Filed: January 22, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2018 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing Plaintiffs' complaint against defendant Residential Funding Company, LLC without prejudice, by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
October 16, 2018 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why the court should not dismiss plaintiffs' claims against defendant Residential Funding for failure to prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 10/31/2018. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
September 26, 2018 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiffs' 18 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting defendants' 21 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing this action with prejudice. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
February 23, 2018 12 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION signed by Judge James L. Robart. The Trust's show cause response is due within 7 days of this Order. (PM)
February 13, 2018 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: subject matter jurisdiction. The Trust is directed to file a response within 7 days of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spesock et al v. U.S. Bank NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Spesock
Represented By: Kenneth Joseph Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Spesock
Represented By: Kenneth Joseph Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, NA
Represented By: Reid E. McEllrath
Represented By: Vanessa Soriano Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, NA
Represented By: Reid E. McEllrath
Represented By: Vanessa Soriano Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaSalle Bank, NA
Represented By: Reid E. McEllrath
Represented By: Vanessa Soriano Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Funding Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?