Estate of Kekona v. Alaska Airlines Inc et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Bernice Kekona
Defendant: Alaska Airlines Inc, Alaska Air Group Inc and Huntleigh USA Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv00116
Filed: January 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 72 Motion to Remand. Per LCR 3(i), case will be remanded 14 days from the date of this Order, on 5/7/2019. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 78 Stipulated Motion to Stay Pretrial Deadlines. Pretrial deadlines will be set when a new trial date is set. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MINUTE ORDER directing Clerk to renote Defendants' 56 MOTION for Summary Judgment and 64 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony; motions renoted for 4/5/2019. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 61 Motion for Extension of Time re Summary Judgment. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 56 ) by 3/11/2019. Defendants shall file their reply to Plaintiff's response by 3/15/2019. The Clerk is DIRECTED to re-note Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 56 ) to 3/15/2019. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 41 Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadlines for Rebuttal Expert Disclosures and Discovery Cutoff. Rebuttal expert disclosures and reports are due no later than December 7, 2018. The discovery cutoff date is EXTENDED to January 21, 2019. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 34 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time for Expert Reports. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 11/8/2018, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 11/30/2018, authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 PROTECTIVE ORDER re parties' 32 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 30 Stipulated Motion for Case Scheduling Order. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 10/8/2018, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 11/13/2018, Discovery Motions due by 10/10/2018, Plaintiffs Pretrial Statement due by 3/27/2019, Motions in Limine due by 4/4/2019, Defendants Pretrial Statement due by 4/8/2019, authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting Huntleigh USA Corporation's 20 Motion to Dismiss; and denying Plaintiff's request for jurisdictional discovery (Dkt. No. 23 at 23). Huntleigh USA Corporation, a Missouri corporation is terminated. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying Defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc.'s and Defendant Alaska Air Group, Inc.'s 14 Motion to Dismiss; denying Plaintiff's request to convert Alaska's motion to one seeking summary judgment (Dkt. No. 17 at 19-20.) Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Kekona v. Alaska Airlines Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Bernice Kekona
Represented By: Brook L. Cunningham
Represented By: Troy Y Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Airlines Inc
Represented By: John T Fetters
Represented By: Caryn Geraghty Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Air Group Inc
Represented By: John T Fetters
Represented By: Caryn Geraghty Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntleigh USA Corporation
Represented By: Aaron D Bigby
Represented By: Mark S. Northcraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?