State of Washington v. Federal Energy Regulatory Commission et al

Plaintiff: State of Washington
Defendant: Federal Energy Regulatory Commission and Kevin J. McIntyre
Case Number: 2:2018cv00146
Filed: January 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing this case with prejudice re parties' 15 Stipulation, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting parties' request for additional time to file report (Dkt. 10 ); Joint Report due by 8/30/2018, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting parties' 7 Stipulated Motion for relief of 26(f) Conference; Joint Status Report due by 6/11/2018, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SWT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Washington v. Federal Energy Regulatory Commission et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Represented By: William R Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Energy Regulatory Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin J. McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?