Seattle Pacific Industries, Inc v. S3 Holding LLC et al

Plaintiff: Seattle Pacific Industries, Inc
Defendant: S3 Holding LLC and Olivia Miller, Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv00224
Filed: February 12, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER re the parties' 45 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadline to Complete Depositions; Discovery deadline extended to 3/14/2019 exclusively for the purpose of allowing the parties to complete their respective depositions, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order 34 PROTECTIVE ORDER re parties' 33 Stipulated MOTION, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order 32 ORDER denying plaintiff's 24 Motion to Seal; directing Clerk to UNSEAL Dkts. 28 and 29 . Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seattle Pacific Industries, Inc v. S3 Holding LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seattle Pacific Industries, Inc
Represented By: Marc C Levy
Represented By: Thomas Shewmake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S3 Holding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olivia Miller, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?