Steele et al v. Wells Fargo Bank NA et al

Plaintiff: Kevin D. Steele and Stephanie A. Steele
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA, Quality Loan Service Corp of Washington and HSBC Bank
Case Number: 2:2018cv00230
Filed: February 13, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2018 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing case with prejudice and without leave to amend. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
June 26, 2018 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Moving Defendants' 13 Motion to Dismiss and dismissing the complaint in its entirely against all Defendants. The court GRANTS the Steeles leave to amend their complaint within 14 days of the filing date of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
May 10, 2018 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiffs' 17 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
March 28, 2018 12 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER extending the deadline until 4/5/2018 for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., and HSBC Bank USA, N.A. to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
February 26, 2018 9 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER extending deadline to 3/29/2018 for Defendants Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and HSBC Bank USA, NA to answer or respond to complaint. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steele et al v. Wells Fargo Bank NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin D. Steele
Represented By: Ajibola O Oladapo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie A. Steele
Represented By: Ajibola O Oladapo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Philip M Guess
Represented By: Peter Anthony Talevich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corp of Washington
Represented By: Robert W McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank
Represented By: Philip M Guess
Represented By: Peter Anthony Talevich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?