Media Partners Corporation v. Circle K Stores Inc.

Plaintiff: Media Partners Corporation
Defendant: Circle K Stores Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00232
Filed: February 13, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2018 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Plaintiff's 19 Fifth Motion for Extension of Time: Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to amended complaint is EXTENDED to 7/27/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/13/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/27/2018, Joint Status Report due by 8/27/2018, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
May 2, 2018 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending time to answer complaint and initial dates re plaintiff's 14 Third Motion: FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 6/4/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/18/2018, Joint Status Report due by 6/18/2018, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
March 30, 2018 13 Opinion or Order of the Court Unopposed Motion and ORDER Extending Time to Answer or Respond to Complaint re Plaintiff's 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The date for Defendant Circle K Stores Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint is extended from 4/6/2018 to 5/7/2018. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)
March 8, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Plaintiff's 10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; deadline for Circle K Stores Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to complaint is extended to 4/6/2018, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Media Partners Corporation v. Circle K Stores Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Media Partners Corporation
Represented By: David Allen Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Circle K Stores Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?