King County v. Azar et al
Plaintiff: King County
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II and U.S. Department of Human and Health Services
Case Number: 2:2018cv00242
Filed: February 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Counts I and II and denied as moot as to Count III, its motion for a preliminary junctions is denied as moot; and denying Defendants' 26 CROSS-MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER re parties' cross-motions for summary judgment and Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction (Dkts 20 , 26 ). Parties are ordered to file letter briefs no more than three pages in length by Friday, May 25, 2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 33 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Re Combined Reply and Opposition Brief to Defendants' Cross Motion. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 18 Stipulated Motion and Agreed Order for Preservation of Remedy and Briefing Schedule for Expedited Cross-Motions for a Preliminary Injunction and Summary Judgment. Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Summary Judgment is due on or before March 29, 2018 and should be noted for May 4, 2018; Opposition and Cross-Motion due by April 17, 2018; Reply and Opposition to the Cross-Motion due by April 27; Reply in support of the Cross-Motion due by May 4, 2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(TH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King County v. Azar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: King County
Represented By: Javier M Guzman(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Josephine T. Morse(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Athanasios P Papailiou
Represented By: Skye L Perryman(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Gregory J Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Human and Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?