Dvaladze v. Delta Air Lines, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Allison Dvaladze
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc., John Doe 1, Jane Doe 1 and Does
Case Number: 2:2018cv00297
Filed: February 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Kitsap
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having notified the Court of settlement of this case, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS ORDERED that this action and all claims asserted herein are DISMISSED without prejudice and without costs to any party. In the event that settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case within 60 days of the date of this order. Any trial date and pretrial dates previously set are hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION FOR CASE SCHEDULING ORDER RE EXPERT DISCLOSURES Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 7/8/2019, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 8/7/2019, Pretrial Order due by 12/27/2019 by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting parties' 14 Stipulated Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel for Defendant Delta Airlines, Inc. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)(Attorneys Caryn Geraghty Jorgensen, John T Fetters, Rachael R Wallace for Delta Air Lines, Inc added; Attorney Mark S. Northcraft terminated.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dvaladze v. Delta Air Lines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Dvaladze
Represented By: James Nathan Bingham
Represented By: Thomas William Bingham
Represented By: Jeffrey C Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Mark S. Northcraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?