Aguilar-Valencia v. United States of America

Petitioner: Enrique Aguilar-Valencia
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2018cv00359
Filed: March 7, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2018 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Government's 13 Motion to Seal Exhibit D and PSR. The Clerk is DIRECTED to maintain Document Numbers 14 -1 and 14 -2 under seal. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
July 23, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Petitioner's unopposed 15 Motion for Extension of Time to file reply to Government's 12 response to Petitioner's 2255 motion. Petitioner's reply due 10/22/2018. Clerk is directed to note 1 Petitioner's 2255 motion for 10/22/2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
May 7, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re United States' 9 Amended Motion for Limited Waiver of Attorney-Client Privilege. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
April 18, 2018 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 8 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to Petitioner's 2255 MOTION. Respondent shall file and serve its answer to Petitioner's Section 2255 Motion no later than July 23, 2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
March 14, 2018 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Petitioner's 2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Furthermore, the Court ORDERS that within forty-five days after service, the United States shall file and serve an Answer. The Clerk is DIRECTED to refer this matter to the Criminal Justice Act Panel Coordinator for appointment of counsel. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(TH) (cc: Petitioner via first class mail)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aguilar-Valencia v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Enrique Aguilar-Valencia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Steven Masada(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?