Kirkwood v. Noble Food Group, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Gary Kirkwood
Defendant: Noble Food Group, Inc, NFG Chicago, LLC, NFG Portland, LLC, NFG Salem, LLC, NFG San Francisco, LLC and NFG Seattle, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00360
Filed: March 8, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 29, 2018 82 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER re parties' 81 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Settlement Approval and extend Deadline to Answer Amended Complaint. The stay is EXTENDED until December 28, 2018. The deadline for Defendants to file their answer to the amended complaint is January 7, 2019. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
November 15, 2018 80 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER re parties' 79 Stipulated Motion to Extend Stay and Joint Notice of Settlement. In order to finalize a formal written settlement agreement and to submit a motion to approve the settlement, the stay is EXTENDED until November 28, 2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
November 1, 2018 78 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 77 Stipulated Motion to Extend Stay and Answer Deadline. The stay is extended until November 14, 2018 and Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' amended complaint is due no later than November 24, 2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
May 4, 2018 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting parties' 12 Joint Motion to Certify Class. The case is conditionally certified as a collective action. This proceeding and all pleadings (including Defendants' deadline to respond to the Complaint and forthcoming Amended Complaint) are STAYED for 180 days. The Clerk is DIRECTED to statistically close this case for the duration of the stay. The status conference scheduled for July 31, 2018 (Dkt. No. 9 ) is VACATED. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirkwood v. Noble Food Group, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Kirkwood
Represented By: Jason M Murphy
Represented By: Richard M Paul, III(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mark Potashnick(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noble Food Group, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFG Chicago, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFG Portland, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFG Salem, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFG San Francisco, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFG Seattle, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?