Emmanuel et al v. King County et al

Plaintiff: Keith Emmanuel, Richard Homchick and Charles Peters
Defendant: King County, City of Bellevue, John Urquhart, Daniel Satterberg, Steven Mylett and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2018cv00377
Filed: March 12, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2018 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 21 Stipulated Motion to Stay Initial Scheduling Deadlines. The deadlines for initial disclosures and submission of the Joint Status Report are moved to 14 days after the Court rules on the County's pending motion or the Court lifts any stay it decides to order, whichever occurs later. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
March 20, 2018 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiffs to file the corrected complaint 2 as an amended complaint no later than Wednesday, March 21, 2018, at 12:00 p.m. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
March 14, 2018 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing Plaintiffs to show cause as to why the court should not treat Plaintiffs' 2 corrected complaint as an amended complaint. Show Cause Response due by Monday, March 19, 2018, at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emmanuel et al v. King County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County
Represented By: Richard L Anderson
Represented By: David JW Hackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Bellevue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Urquhart
Represented By: Richard L Anderson
Represented By: David JW Hackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Satterberg
Represented By: Richard L Anderson
Represented By: David JW Hackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Mylett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Emmanuel
Represented By: Hozaifa Y Cassubhai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Homchick
Represented By: Hozaifa Y Cassubhai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Peters
Represented By: Hozaifa Y Cassubhai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?