Torres v. SN Servicing Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Hugo Macias Torres
Defendant: SN Servicing Corporation and NP162, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00380
Filed: March 13, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2018 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having advised the Court that this matter has been resolved, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs. In the event settlement is not perfected, either party may move to reopen and trial will be scheduled, provided such motion is filed within 90 days of the date of this Order. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
August 8, 2018 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER directing NP162 LLC to file an amended corporate disclosure statement, signed by counsel of record, within twenty-eight (28) days of the date of this Minute Order. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
June 27, 2018 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER re 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement; directing defendant NP162, LLC, on or before 7/20/2018, to file a supplemental disclosure identifying each owner/member of the Member LLCs and indicate the state in which each member/owner was a citizen at the time the Complaint was filed. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
May 25, 2018 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER directing defendant NP162 LLC, within 14 days of this Minute Order, to identify all of its members or owners and indicate the citizenship of each member or owner. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres v. SN Servicing Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugo Macias Torres
Represented By: Vicente Omar Barraza
Represented By: Christina Latta Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SN Servicing Corporation
Represented By: Scott D Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NP162, LLC
Represented By: Scott D Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?