Hyperion Entertainment C.V.B.A. et al v. Itec, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Hyperion Entertainment C.V.B.A.
Defendant: Itec, LLC, Amiga, Inc, Amino Development Corporation and Cloanto Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv00381
Filed: March 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting 71 Motion to Extend Trial Date and Related Deadlines. Jury Trial is CONTINUED to 4/13/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Discovery Motions due by 11/8/2019, Discovery completed by 12/10/2019, Dispositive motions due by 1/8/2020, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 2/21/2020, Motions in Limine due by 3/11/2020, Agreed Pretrial Order due by 3/26/2020, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 4/2/2020. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant Hyperion Entertainment CVBA's 52 Motion to Dismiss in Part. Plaintiffs' First Cause of Action (Breach of Contract) as brought by Plaintiff Cloanto and Seventh Cause of Action (Lanham Act §43(a)) as brought by Plaintiff Cloanto are DISMISSED. Given the procedural history of this case, the Court does not grant Plaintiffs leave to amend the Second Amended Complaint at this time. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(PM)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 67 Motion for Partial Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (see order for specifics) (MW)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 45 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting the Parties' 44 Stipulated Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint. Hyperion Entertainment CVBA shall respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint within 14-days after service thereof, but no earlier than January 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER directing Clerk to remove from the Court's motions calendar Defendant Cloanto Corporation's 18 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SWT)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting Hyperion Entertainment C.V.B.A.'s motion to consolidate (filed in C18-535, Dkt. #35). This case is hereby transferred to the Honorable Ricardo S. Martinez as related to Hyperion Entertainment C. V.B.A. v. Itec LLC et al., No. C18-0381RSM. All future pleadings shall bear the cause number C18-0381 RSM. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re: 9 Stipulated Motion Extending Initial Scheduling Dates. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 6/29/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/6/2018, Combined Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 7/13/2018. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hyperion Entertainment C.V.B.A. et al v. Itec, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hyperion Entertainment C.V.B.A.
Represented By: Rhett V Barney
Represented By: Robert J Carlson
Represented By: Sarah E Elsden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Itec, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amiga, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amino Development Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cloanto Corporation
Represented By: Michael G Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?