Smith et al v. Aircraft Specialties Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Carol Ann Smith and Stephen L. Smith
Defendant: Aircraft Specialties Services, Inc. and John Does 1-20
Case Number: 2:2018cv00412
Filed: March 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Island
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting Defendant's 18 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Plaintiffs' 21 Motion to Amend; and denying Defendant's 33 Motion for Sanctions. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant are DISMISSED. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 28 Motion for Relief from Deadline for Mediation. The mediation deadline in this case is hereby EXTENDED to 4/30/2019. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 12 Stipulated Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorneys for Defendant. Attorney Yvonne M. Benson and Maggie Diefenbach and the law firm Gordon Thomas Honeywell hereby withdraw as counsel of reco rd for Defendant Aircraft Specialties Services, Inc. Douglas A. Hofmann and the law firm Williams, Kastner & Gibbs, PLLC are hereby SUBSTITUTED as counsel of record for Defendant Aircraft Specialties Services, Inc. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. Aircraft Specialties Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aircraft Specialties Services, Inc.
Represented By: Yvonne M. Benson
Represented By: Maggie Diefenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Ann Smith
Represented By: Alisa R Brodkowitz
Represented By: Bruce James Lambrecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen L. Smith
Represented By: Alisa R Brodkowitz
Represented By: Bruce James Lambrecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?