Wesley v. CBS Radio Services, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Jesse Wesley
Defendant: Michael Fashana, CBS Radio Services, Inc., Cindy Johnson, CBS Radio Stations, Inc., CBS Radio Stations, Inc and CBS Radio Services, Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv00466
Filed: March 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Kitsap
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 69 MOTIONS IN LIMINE , filed by Plaintiff Jesse Wesley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/20/2019, (Valencia, Favian)
September 9, 2019 Filing 68 MOTIONS IN LIMINE , filed by Defendants CBS Radio Services, Inc, CBS Radio Stations, Inc, Michael Fashana, Cindy Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/20/2019, (Silke, David)
July 5, 2019 Filing 67 ANSWER to #64 Amended Complaint by CBS Radio Services, Inc, CBS Radio Stations, Inc, Michael Fashana, Cindy Johnson.(Silke, David)
July 3, 2019 Filing 66 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Jesse Wesley (Valencia, Favian)
June 21, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Goldie A Davidoff for Defendants CBS Radio Services, Inc, CBS Radio Stations, Inc, Michael Fashana, Cindy Johnson. (Davidoff, Goldie)
June 21, 2019 Filing 64 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) CBS Radio Services, Inc, CBS Radio Stations, Inc, Michael Fashana, Cindy Johnson, filed by Jesse Wesley.(Valencia, Favian)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Amend Complaint. Counsel is directed to e-file their Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MW)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #25 Motion to Compel; #40 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Re Protective Order Motion; #47 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MW)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #44 Motion for Extension of Time as moot, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
May 18, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re #54 MOTIONS IN LIMINE ; by Plaintiff Jesse Wesley. (Valencia, Favian)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 AMENDED ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: 6 days. Bench Trial is set for 10/7/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 15106 before Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Motions in Limine due by 9/9/2019, Pretrial Order due by 9/25/2019, Trial briefs and trial exhibits to be submitted by 10/2/2019, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER re: parties' #56 Stipulated Motion to Postpone Trial Date and Extend Deadlines, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. The current trial date of June 3 is postponed to October 7, 2019 and the remaining pre-trial deadlines will be continued in accordance with this date. (KERR)
May 14, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re #55 MOTIONS IN LIMINE ; by Defendants CBS Radio Services, Inc, CBS Radio Stations, Inc, Michael Fashana, Cindy Johnson. (Silke, David)
May 13, 2019 Filing 56 Stipulated MOTION TO POSTPONE TRIAL DATE, filed by Defendants CBS Radio Services, Inc, CBS Radio Stations, Inc, Michael Fashana, Cindy Johnson. Noting Date 5/13/2019, (Silke, David)
May 6, 2019 Filing 55 MOTIONS IN LIMINE , filed by Defendants CBS Radio Services, Inc, CBS Radio Stations, Inc, Michael Fashana, Cindy Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/17/2019, (Silke, David)
May 6, 2019 Filing 54 MOTIONS IN LIMINE , filed by Plaintiff Jesse Wesley. Noting Date 5/24/2019, (Valencia, Favian)
April 12, 2019 Filing 53 Supplemental DECLARATION of David W. Silke filed by Defendants CBS Radio Services, Inc, CBS Radio Stations, Inc, Michael Fashana, Cindy Johnson re #42 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Silke, David)
April 12, 2019 Filing 52 DECLARATION of Michael Fashana filed by Defendants CBS Radio Services, Inc, CBS Radio Stations, Inc, Michael Fashana, Cindy Johnson re #42 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Silke, David)
April 12, 2019 Filing 51 REPLY, filed by Defendants CBS Radio Services, Inc, CBS Radio Stations, Inc, Michael Fashana, Cindy Johnson, TO RESPONSE to #42 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Silke, David)
April 8, 2019 Filing 50 DECLARATION of Favian Valencia filed by Plaintiff Jesse Wesley re #42 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Valencia, Favian)
April 8, 2019 Filing 49 DECLARATION of Jesse Wesley filed by Plaintiff Jesse Wesley re #42 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Valencia, Favian)
April 8, 2019 Filing 48 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Jesse Wesley, to #42 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Oral Argument Requested. (Valencia, Favian)
April 8, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION for Reconsideration re #45 Order on Motion for Protective Order , filed by Plaintiff Jesse Wesley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/8/2019, (Valencia, Favian)
March 27, 2019 Filing 46 RESPONSE, by Defendants CBS Radio Services, Inc, CBS Radio Stations, Inc, Michael Fashana, Cindy Johnson, to #44 MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond To Defendants' SJM. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Silke, David)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting defendants' #38 Motion for Protective Order Relating to Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendant CBS Radio Stations, Inc. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
March 21, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond To Defendants' SJM, filed by Plaintiff Jesse Wesley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/29/2019, (Valencia, Favian)
March 18, 2019 Filing 43 DECLARATION of David W. Silke filed by Defendants CBS Radio Services, Inc, CBS Radio Stations, Inc, Michael Fashana, Cindy Johnson re #42 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit)(Silke, David)
March 18, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Defendants CBS Radio Services, Inc, CBS Radio Stations, Inc, Michael Fashana, Cindy Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/12/2019, (Silke, David)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting defendants' #29 Ex Parte Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (Dkts. #27 -1, #28 shall remain sealed)
March 11, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response Re Protective Order Motion (ECF 38), filed by Plaintiff Jesse Wesley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Proposed Response to be filed) Noting Date 3/22/2019, (Valencia, Favian)
March 8, 2019 Filing 39 REPLY, filed by Defendants CBS Radio Services, Inc, CBS Radio Stations, Inc, Michael Fashana, Cindy Johnson, TO RESPONSE to #38 MOTION for Protective Order Relating to Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendant CBS Radio Stations, Inc. (Silke, David)
February 28, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Protective Order Relating to Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendant CBS Radio Stations, Inc., filed by Defendants CBS Radio Services, Inc, CBS Radio Stations, Inc, Michael Fashana, Cindy Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/8/2019, (Silke, David)
February 22, 2019 Filing 37 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Jesse Wesley, TO RESPONSE to #25 MOTION to Compel And/Or To Bind Defendant's To Testimony (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit E - Email correspondence re 30b6 designation, #2 Exhibit Exhibit F - email re depositions of individual co-defendants)(Valencia, Favian)
February 15, 2019 Filing 36 DECLARATION of David W. Silke in Support of Defendants' Opposition filed by Defendants CBS Radio Services, Inc, CBS Radio Stations, Inc, Michael Fashana, Cindy Johnson re #25 MOTION to Compel And/Or To Bind Defendant's To Testimony (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Silke, David)
February 15, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE, by Defendants CBS Radio Services, Inc, CBS Radio Stations, Inc, Michael Fashana, Cindy Johnson, to #25 MOTION to Compel And/Or To Bind Defendant's To Testimony. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Silke, David)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER re #33 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Martell Harris for Plaintiff Jesse Wesley, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
February 14, 2019 Filing 33 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Martell Harris FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Jesse Wesley (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5650277 (Valencia, Favian)
February 8, 2019 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Favian Valencia filed by Plaintiff Jesse Wesley re #24 MOTION to Amend Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Email Correspondence Stipulating to Amendment of Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Relevant Portions of Plaintiff's Deposition Transcript)(Valencia, Favian)
February 8, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Jesse Wesley, TO RESPONSE to #24 MOTION to Amend Complaint (Valencia, Favian)
February 6, 2019 Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER RE-NOTING #29 MOTION to Seal Ex Parte Motion to Seal Exhibits; Noting Date 2/22/2019 (KERR)
February 5, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Seal Ex Parte Motion to Seal Exhibits, filed by Defendants CBS Radio Services, Inc, CBS Radio Stations, Inc, Michael Fashana, Cindy Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/5/2019, (Silke, David)
February 5, 2019 Filing 28 DISREGARD THIS FILING - filed in error per counsel. SEALED DOCUMENT EXHIBIT Wesley Transcipt Exhibits 01-21 re #27 Declaration, by Defendants CBS Radio Services, Inc, CBS Radio Stations, Inc, Michael Fashana, Cindy Johnson (Silke, David) Modified on 2/5/2019 (PS). Modified on 2/5/2019 to seal docket entry at request of counsel (KB).
February 5, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #28 Exhibit, : DISREGARD THIS FILING-exhibits filed in error per counsel. (PS)
February 5, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #28 Exhibit, #27 Declaration: Modified on 02/05/2019 to seal Exhibit A to the Declaration of David W. Silke #27 -1 and docket #28 at request of counsel - counsel will be filing a Motion to Seal. (KB)
February 4, 2019 Filing 27 DECLARATION of David W. Silke in Support of Defendant's Opposition filed by Defendants CBS Radio Services, Inc, CBS Radio Stations, Inc, Michael Fashana, Cindy Johnson re #24 MOTION to Amend Complaint (Attachments: SEALED DOCUMENT #1 Exhibit A)(Silke, David) Modified on 2/5/2019 to seal Exhibit A at request of counsel (KB).
February 4, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE, by Defendants CBS Radio Services, Inc, CBS Radio Stations, Inc, Michael Fashana, Cindy Johnson, to #24 MOTION to Amend Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Silke, David)
February 1, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Compel And/Or To Bind Defendant's To Testimony, filed by Plaintiff Jesse Wesley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Notice of Deposition 30(b)(6), #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Defendant CBS Objections to 30(b)(6), #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Response to Objections, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Excerpts of Designees Depositions Transcript, #5 Proposed Order Proposed order) Noting Date 2/22/2019, (Valencia, Favian)
January 18, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Amend Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Jesse Wesley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Proposed Amended Complaint with edits, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/8/2019, (Valencia, Favian)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting parties' #22 Second Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time Deadlines: Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 2/15/2019, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 3/19/2019, Supplementing of expert witness reports due by 4/16/2019, Deadline for expert depositions is 4/30/2019. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
January 11, 2019 Filing 22 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery , filed by Plaintiff Jesse Wesley. Noting Date 1/11/2019, (Valencia, Favian)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AMENDED ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: 6 days. Bench Trial is set for 6/3/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 15106 before Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Amended Pleadings due by 1/18/2019, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 1/18/2019, Discovery completed by 3/15/2019, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 3/15/2019, Dispositive motions due by 3/18/2019, Motions in Limine due by 5/6/2019, Pretrial Order due by 5/22/2019, Trial briefs and trial exhibits to be submitted by 5/29/2019, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #12 Motion to Waive Physical Office Requirement For Pro Hac Vice Petition signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH)
November 16, 2018 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time , filed by Plaintiff Jesse Wesley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/16/2018, (Valencia, Favian)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PROTECTIVE ORDER re parties' #17 Stipulation, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
November 2, 2018 Filing 17 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER - Protective Order by parties (Silke, David) Modified docket text on 11/5/2018 to include full title of document (SWT).
November 1, 2018 Filing 16 LETTER from the Court re parties' #15 Stipulation, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. The Court is declining to sign. (SWT)
October 19, 2018 Filing 15 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER (Approved by OPC) by parties (Silke, David)
October 1, 2018 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on CBS Radio Stations, Inc on 2/28/2018, filed by Plaintiff Jesse Wesley. (Valencia, Favian)
August 24, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Goldie A Davidoff on behalf of Defendants CBS Radio Services, Inc, CBS Radio Stations, Inc, Michael Fashana, Cindy Johnson. (Davidoff, Goldie)
August 23, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION Waive Physical Office Requirement For Pro Hac Vice Petition , filed by Plaintiff Jesse Wesley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/23/2018, (Valencia, Favian)
May 17, 2018 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: 6 days. Bench Trial is set for 6/3/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 15106 before Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Joinder of Parties due by 6/14/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 12/5/2018, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 12/5/2018, Discovery completed by 2/3/2019, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 2/17/2019, Dispositive motions due by 3/5/2019, Motions in Limine due by 5/6/2019, Pretrial Order due by 5/22/2019, Trial briefs to be submitted by 5/29/2019 (KERR)
May 15, 2018 Attorney David W Silke for CBS Radio Services, Inc, CBS Radio Stations, Inc, Michael Fashana, Cindy Johnson added; per #8 Notice of Appearance. (SWT)
May 15, 2018 Filing 10 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 6. (Silke, David)
May 15, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Sarah N Turner for Defendants CBS Radio Services, Inc, CBS Radio Stations, Inc, Michael Fashana, Cindy Johnson. (Silke, David)
May 15, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David W Silke on behalf of Defendants CBS Radio Services, Inc, CBS Radio Stations, Inc, Michael Fashana, Cindy Johnson. (Silke, David)
May 14, 2018 Filing 7 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Jesse Wesley (Valencia, Favian)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 5/15/2018, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
April 5, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint; by CBS Radio Services, Inc, CBS Radio Stations, Inc, Michael Fashana, Cindy Johnson.(Turner, Sarah)
April 3, 2018 Filing 4 PRAECIPE to attach document re #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants CBS Radio Services, Inc, CBS Radio Stations, Inc (Turner, Sarah)
March 30, 2018 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re: receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (DJ)
March 30, 2018 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (DJ)
March 30, 2018 NOTICE to Filer: PHV/ECF NOTICE re: Attorney Goldie A. Davidoff. It will necessary for you to apply for Pro Hac Vice admission in this case. The fee is $231.00 per attorney, per case. The application shall be e-filed for you by local counsel. Please take a moment to download the admission form from our web site - wawd.uscourts.gov. If you have any questions about admission, e-filing, or to register for training, please call the ECF Support Desk at 1-866-323-9293. Thank you. (Notice sent to attorney via ECF Ad Hoc feature). (DJ)
March 29, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by CBS Radio Services, Inc., CBS Radio Stations, Inc. (Turner, Sarah)
March 29, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 18-2-08085-1; (Receipt # 0981-5259881), filed by CBS Radio Services, Inc., Michael Fashana, Cindy Johnson, CBS Radio Stations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Turner, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wesley v. CBS Radio Services, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Fashana
Represented By: Sarah N Turner
Represented By: Goldie A Davidoff
Represented By: David W Silke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Radio Services, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah N Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Johnson
Represented By: Sarah N Turner
Represented By: Goldie A Davidoff
Represented By: David W Silke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Radio Stations, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah N Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Radio Stations, Inc
Represented By: Goldie A Davidoff
Represented By: David W Silke
Represented By: Sarah N Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Radio Services, Inc
Represented By: Goldie A Davidoff
Represented By: David W Silke
Represented By: Sarah N Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Wesley
Represented By: Favian Valencia
Represented By: Martell Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?