Nikaj et al v. United States Department of State
Plaintiff: Silvana Nikaj and Carney & Marchi, P.S.
Defendant: United States Department of State
Case Number: 2:2018cv00496
Filed: April 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting Defendant's 18 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Plaintiffs' 20 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER re Defendant's 16 Notice of Appropriations Received and Order re resetting deadline. The stay in this case is LIFTED. The current briefing schedule (Dkt. No. 13 ) is EXTENDED to the following dates: Dispositive motions d ue by 2/15/2019, Response and Cross-Motion due by 3/15/2019, Reply in Support of Dispositive Motion and Response to Cross-Motion due by 4/10/2019, Reply in support of Cross-Motion due by 5/6/2019. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's unopposed 14 Motion to stay the briefing schedule. The briefing schedule is STAYED until appropriations have been restored to Defendant. The briefing schedule shall be EXTENDED by the number of days equal to the duration of the lapse of appropriations. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 12 Stipulation and Orderre schedule. The Clerk is directed to VACATE the status conference, currently set for November 13, 2018. Defendant's dispositive motion is due by 1/11/2019; Plaintiffs' respon se and cross-motion is due by 2/8/2019; Defendants' reply and response to cross-motion is due by 3/1/2019; Plaintiffs' reply in support of its cross-motion is due by 3/22/2019. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER to Show Cause. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. Plaintiffs' response is due within fourteen (14) days of this order. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nikaj et al v. United States Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvana Nikaj
Represented By: Nicholas Wright Marchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carney & Marchi, P.S.
Represented By: Nicholas Wright Marchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?