Delashaw v. Seattle Times Company et al

Plaintiff: Johnny B. Delashaw, Jr.
Defendant: Seattle Times Company and Charles Cobbs
Case Number: 2:2018cv00537
Filed: April 11, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2018 49 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREEMENT REGARDING DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION AND ORDER re 48 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
September 17, 2018 46 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER re parties' 45 Stipulated Motion, by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
September 6, 2018 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 42 Stipulated Protected Order. Parties directed to show cause within seven (7) days why the court can enter a protective order that relates to disclosures in the MQAC Proceeding, and why section of the stipulated protective order complies with Local Rule 26(c). Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
August 31, 2018 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying the parties' 40 stipulated motion for entry of their agreed protective order. The motion is denied without prejudice to re-filing in a manner that comports with the court's local rules. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
August 23, 2018 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part the Times' 27 Motion to Dismiss and denying Dr. Cobbs' 30 Motion to Dismiss signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
July 9, 2018 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Seal Plaintiff's Amended Complaint re parties' 26 Stipulated Motion. The Court orders the clerk to seal Dr. Delashaw's original Amended Complaint (Dkt. # 20 ). Dr. Delashaw's corrected Amended Complaint (Dkt. # 25 ) is Plaintiff's operative complaint. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
July 2, 2018 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER finding as moot Defendant Cobb's 19 Motion to Dismiss Complaint; no further briefing or hearing shall occur. The Court's finding is without prejudice to any party's right to respond as that party deems appropriate based on Dr. Delashaw's amended complaint. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
June 26, 2018 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 21 Stipulated Motion. The Court strikes Seattle Times' motion to dismiss Dr. Delashaw's complaint (Dkt. # 17 ), subject to the Seattle Times' right to renew its motion or file a response the Seattle Times deems to be appropriate based on Dr. Delashaw's amended complaint. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
May 15, 2018 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Stipulated Motion to Extend Initial Scheduling Deadlines. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 6/18/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/2/2018, Joint Status Report due by 7/9/2018. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delashaw v. Seattle Times Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny B. Delashaw, Jr.
Represented By: Tyler Lawrence Farmer
Represented By: Arthur W. Harrigan, Jr.
Represented By: Irwin H. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seattle Times Company
Represented By: Jessica L Goldman
Represented By: Christopher T Wion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Cobbs
Represented By: Jehiel I Baer
Represented By: Malaika M Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?