Sound Action et al v. United States Army Corps of Engineers
Plaintiff: |
Sound Action, Friends of the San Juans and Washington Environmental Council |
Defendant: |
United States Army Corps of Engineers |
Case Number: |
2:2018cv00733 |
Filed: |
May 21, 2018 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Washington |
Office: |
Seattle Office |
County: |
King |
Presiding Judge: |
Brian A Tsuchida |
Nature of Suit: |
Environmental Matters |
Cause of Action: |
05 U.S.C. § 551 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 20, 2020 |
Filing
50
ORDER granting parties' 49 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' 46 Motion for Costs and Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge James L. Robart.(PM)
|
April 24, 2020 |
Filing
48
ORDER granting Parties' 47 Stipulated Motion to Stay Briefing on 46 Motion for Costs and Attorneys' Fees. Briefing is stayed for 90 days, until July 23, 2020. By July 23, 2020, Plaintiffs and Defendants shall apprise this Court of the status of Plaintiffs' 46 motion and any request for action by this Court. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
|
April 17, 2020 |
Filing
45
ORDER dismissing case with prejudice re parties' 44 Stipulated Motion of Dismissal. Plaintiffs shall file a motion for fees and costs within 30 days of the date of this order of dismissal and a concurrent motion to stay all briefing on the motion for fees and costs for 90 days in order to facilitate settlement discussions between the Parties. Signed by Judge James L. Robart.(PM)
|
October 30, 2019 |
Filing
42
ORDER granting Defendant's 37 Motion for Voluntary Remand. The Corps is directed to submit a status report within 120 days of the filing date of this order that is consistent with the terms of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
|
July 2, 2019 |
Filing
40
STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for Defendant to file reply to 37 Motion for Voluntary Remand re parties' 39 Stipulated Motion. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
|
May 30, 2019 |
Filing
36
ORDER re: Status Reports (Dkts. 33 , 35 ). Defendant shall file its motion for voluntary remand no later than 6/13/2019. Plaintiffs shall file their response to Defendant's motion for voluntary remand no later than 7/2/20197 /1/2019. Defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion for voluntary remand no later than 7/5/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) Modified on 5/30/2019 to modify date of response to motion for voluntary remand to correspond with date in order (KB).
|
May 24, 2019 |
Filing
34
STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties' 32 Stipulation. The date for parties to file the required status reports is extended to 5/24/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
|
May 8, 2019 |
Filing
30
ORDER granting plaintiffs' 29 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Second Claim for Relief. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
|
May 2, 2019 |
Filing
28
STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties' 27 Stipulated Motion: The Corps shall file the administrative record by 5/8/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart.(MW)
|
February 5, 2019 |
Filing
21
ORDER denying Defendant's 13 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
|
November 6, 2018 |
Filing
19
STIPULATION AND ORDER deferring filing of Combined Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan re parties' 18 Stipulated Motion: Deadline for parties to file their Combined Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan extended to 14 days after the Court rules on Corps' pending Motion to Dismiss, Dkt. 13 . Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
|
October 16, 2018 |
Filing
16
STIPULATION AND ORDER for Entry of Scheduling Order re parties' 15 Stipulation; RENOTING defendants' 13 MOTION to Dismiss Claim 1 For Lack of Jurisdiction : Noting Date 11/15/2018, by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
|
July 24, 2018 |
Filing
12
ORDER re: 11 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' deadline to answer or respond to the complaint is extended to 9/28/2018. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?