McClellon v. Wells Fargo Advisors Financial Network, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Donte McClellon
Defendant: Wells Fargo Advisors Financial Network, LLC and Wells Fargo Clearing Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00852
Filed: June 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER re: Plaintiff's 49 Motion seeking recusal of the Honorable Judge Coughenour. The Court finds and ORDERS that Judge Coughenour's 54 Order declining to recuse himself is AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) cc: Plaintiff via first class mail
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 49 Motion to Vacate, to reopen the case, and for recusal signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 45 Report and Recommendations and 41 Application to Appeal IFP by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. cc to plaintiff via US Mail / 9th Circuit Court of Appeals via ECF (GT)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER REFERRING Plaintiff's 41 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis to the Hon. Brian A. Tsuchida. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff's 38 Motion for Reconsideration authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 32 Motion to Vacate judgment and for leave to amend complaint signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting Defendants' 27 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's amended complaint (Dkt. No. 26 ) is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via first class mail)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting Defendant's 10 Motion to Dismiss and denying Plaintiff's 21 Motion to Remand. Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice and with leave to amend. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via first class mail)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClellon v. Wells Fargo Advisors Financial Network, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donte McClellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Advisors Financial Network, LLC
Represented By: Taylor Washburn
Represented By: Andrew Gordon Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Clearing Services, LLC
Represented By: Taylor Washburn
Represented By: Andrew Gordon Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?