Block v. Washington State Bar Association et al
Plaintiff: Anne K Block
Defendant: Washington State Bar Association, Kevin Bank, Linda Eide, Allison Sato, City of Duvall, Lori Batiot, City of Gold Bar, Joe Beavers, Bonnie Scruggs Jones, Crystal Hill Pennington, Keating, Bucklin, McCormick, Inc., Amanda Butler, Shannon Ragonesi, Kenyon Disend, PLLC, Michel Kenyon, Ann Marie Soto, Rachel Turpin, Snohomish County, Sara DiVittorio, Chris Leya, Tina Murphy, John Pennington, Mark Roe, Sean Reay, Dana Tappendorf, Adam Cornell, Mikol AJ Tempski, Ron Carpenter, Barbara Madsen, Association of Washington Cities, Shelly Rowe, Jodi Wycoff, Caroline Darrow, Christie Law Group and Thomas Miller
Case Number: 2:2018cv00907
Filed: June 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER DECLINING TO ISSUE INDICATIVE RULING UNDER RULE 62.1 re Plaintiff's 75 Motion to Set Aside Final Order and 76 Motion for Order Vacating Order. The Court hereby finds and ORDERS that Plaintiff Anne Block's Motion to Set Aside Final Order and Amended Motion for Order Vacating Order, Dkts. # 75 and # 76 , are DENIED. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SR) Modified on 3/30/2021: cc to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals (PM).
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 17 Motion to Disqualify. In accordance with LCR 3 (f), this Order is referred to the Honorable Ronald B. Leighton for review of this decision. Ms. Block has violated the Bar Order at Dkt. #122 in Block v. Washingt on State Bar Association et al., Case No. 2:15-cv-02018-RSM (W.D. Wash. 2016). This case is accordingly DISMISSED. All pending motions 51 are terminated at moot. This case shall remain open pending review of this decision by Judge Leighton. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM) cc: Judge Leighton
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting Defendants' 46 Motion for Relief from Deadline. The deadline for responsive pleadings in this matter shall be delayed until 21 days after the Court issues a final order regarding the pending Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing Plaintiff to show cause why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to the Bar Order of 4/13/2016 (15-cv-2018RSM). Show cause response due within two weeks of this order. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry), (1)the plaintiffs objections to Judge Carlsons Report and Recommendation, (Doc. 3), are OVERRULED;(2)the Report and Recommendation of Judge Carlson, (Doc. 2), is ADOPTED IN ITS ENTIRETY;(3 )the Clerk of Court is directed to TRANSFER the above-captioned case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington; andthe Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE.ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 6/20/18. (bs) [Transferred from pamd on 6/20/2018.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Block v. Washington State Bar Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne K Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Bar Association
Represented By: David W Silke
Represented By: Shannon Wodnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Eide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Sato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Duvall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Batiot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Gold Bar
Represented By: Patrick McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Beavers
Represented By: Patrick McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie Scruggs Jones
Represented By: Patrick McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Hill Pennington
Represented By: Patrick McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keating, Bucklin, McCormick, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda Gabrielle Butler
Represented By: Shannon M Ragonesi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Butler
Represented By: Amanda Gabrielle Butler
Represented By: Shannon M Ragonesi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Ragonesi
Represented By: Amanda Gabrielle Butler
Represented By: Shannon M Ragonesi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenyon Disend, PLLC
Represented By: Michael R Kenyon
Represented By: Ann Marie Josephine Soto
Represented By: Rachel B Turpin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michel Kenyon
Represented By: Michael R Kenyon
Represented By: Ann Marie Josephine Soto
Represented By: Rachel B Turpin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Marie Soto
Represented By: Michael R Kenyon
Represented By: Ann Marie Josephine Soto
Represented By: Rachel B Turpin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Turpin
Represented By: Michael R Kenyon
Represented By: Ann Marie Josephine Soto
Represented By: Rachel B Turpin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snohomish County
Represented By: Sean D. Reay
Represented By: Mikolaj T. Tempski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara DiVittorio
Represented By: Sean D. Reay
Represented By: Mikolaj T. Tempski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Leya
Represented By: Sean D. Reay
Represented By: Mikolaj T. Tempski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Murphy
Represented By: Sean D. Reay
Represented By: Mikolaj T. Tempski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Roe
Represented By: Sean D. Reay
Represented By: Mikolaj T. Tempski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Reay
Represented By: Sean D. Reay
Represented By: Mikolaj T. Tempski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Tappendorf
Represented By: Sean D. Reay
Represented By: Mikolaj T. Tempski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Cornell
Represented By: Sean D. Reay
Represented By: Mikolaj T. Tempski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikol AJ Tempski
Represented By: Sean D. Reay
Represented By: Mikolaj T. Tempski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Carpenter
Represented By: Leslie R Seffern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Madsen
Represented By: Leslie R Seffern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Association of Washington Cities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelly Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jodi Wycoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caroline Darrow
Represented By: Sean D. Reay
Represented By: Mikolaj T. Tempski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christie Law Group
Represented By: Thomas P Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Miller
Represented By: Thomas P Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?