June 16, 2022 |
Filing
218
ORDER granting Parties' 217 Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss. Pursuant to the stipulated motion, it is so ordered. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SB)
|
June 29, 2021 |
Filing
196
ORDER re parties' 192 Stipulated Motion. Talus Management Services, LLC's 161 motion for summary judgment is withdrawn as moot. The JR Hayes & Sons, Inc./Talus 7&8 Investment, LLC 147 motion for summary judgment is partially withdrawn as moot only as it relates to the claims of ORA Talus 90, LLC and Resmark. The Court dismisses the ORA Talus 90, LLC's and Resmark Equity Partners, LLC's claims for relief only as against Talus Management Services, LLC and Talus 7&8 Investment, LLC. The Court also dismisses Talus Management Services, LLC's and Talus 7&8 Investment, LLC's claims for relief only as against ORA Talus 90, LLC and Resmark Equity Partners, LLC. The dismissals are with prejudice as to the dismissed parties only and are without prejudice or other effect on the respective claims alleged by the dismissed parties against other parties, not being dismissed here, that are contained in the same claims for relief and with each party bearing its own costs. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(PM) (Main Document 196 replaced on 6/29/2021. Incorrect order posted initially) (PM).
|
June 25, 2021 |
Filing
191
ORDER re Parties' 186 Stipulated Motion. The Court grants the stipulated request that (1) the second, third, fourth, fifth, and sixth counterclaims alleged by ORA Talus 90, LLC and Resmark Equity Partners, LLC against the City of Issaquah be w ithdrawn without prejudice to prosecution the first counterclaim alleged by ORA Talus 90, LLC and Resmark Equity Partners, LLC and (2) the City of Issaquah's 163 Motion for Summary Judgment against ORA Talus 90, LLC and Resmark Equity Partners, LLC be withdrawn as moot. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SR)
|
June 24, 2021 |
Filing
187
ORDER granting the parties' 184 Stipulated Motion. All causes of action against Kulchin Foundation Drilling Company are dismissed with prejudice and without costs to any party. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
|
June 21, 2021 |
Filing
180
ORDER re the parties' 179 Stipulated Motion. The Court grants the stipulated request to renote the JR Hayes' 164 summary judgment motion to July 2, 2021 and to adjust the parties' briefing schedule according. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
|
June 16, 2021 |
Filing
178
ORDER granting the parties' 177 Joint Motion. The deadline for expert witness discovery is extended to allow for one additional hour of deposition time with expert Keith Cline on a date and time mutually convenient to all parties. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
|
February 23, 2021 |
Filing
138
ORDER denying Plaintiff City of Issaquah's 108 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
|
January 8, 2021 |
Filing
134
ORDER re the parties' 133 Stipulated Motion. The Court GRANTS parties' stipulated motion and ORDERS that discovery-related deadlines are continued as set forth in the Court's forthcoming scheduling order. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
|
December 7, 2020 |
Filing
128
ORDER granting Plaintiff City of Issaquah's 122 Motion for Leave to File Over-length Reply Brief. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
|
October 26, 2020 |
Filing
107
ORDER re Parties' 106 Stipulated Motion to Continue Discovery Related Deadlines. Jury Trial is set for 7/26/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Motions related to discovery due by 11/16/2020, Lay discovery completed by 12/11/ 2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 1/15/2021, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 2/19/2021, Commencement of expert depositions is 3/15/2021, Expert discovery completed by 5/5/2021, Dispositive motions and m otions challenging experts due by 5/19/2021, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 5/26/2021, Motions in Limine due by 6/8/2021, Agreed Pretrial Order due by 6/30/2021. Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 7/6/2021. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
|
September 4, 2020 |
Filing
105
STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Deposition Protocol re Parties' 103 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LH)
|
June 3, 2020 |
Filing
102
ORDER re parties' 101 Stipulated Motion to Continue Trial Date and Related Deadlines. Jury Trial CONTINUED to 7/26/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Motions related to discovery due by 10/14/2020, Lay Discovery completed b y 11/11/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 12/16/2020, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 1/20/2021, Commencement of expert depositions due 2/16/2021, Expert discovery completed by 4/5/2021, Dispositive moti ons due by 4/19/2021, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 5/5/2021, Motions in Limine due by 6/8/2021, Agreed Pretrial Order due by 6/30/2021, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 7/6/2021. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(PM)
|
February 25, 2020 |
Filing
97
ORDER re parties' 96 Stipulated Motion to continue trial dates and related pre-trial deadlines. Jury Trial is CONTINUED to 2/22/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Motions related to discovery due by 5/7/2020, Lay Discovery completed by 6/5/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26 (a)(2) due by 7/17/2020, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 8/18/2020, Commencement of expert depositions is September 15, 2020, Expert discovery completed by November 6 , 2020, Dispositive motions and motions challenging experts due by 11/19/2020, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 12/31/2020, Motions in Limine due by 1/7/2021, Agreed Pretrial Order due by 1/29/2021, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 2/8/2021. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(PM)
|
January 17, 2020 |
Filing
92
ORDER re Parties' 91 Stipulation To Extend Certain Deadlines: Motions related to discovery due by 3/19/2020, Lay discovery to be completed by 4/14/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 5/1/2020, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 5/29/2020, Commencement of expert depositions by 6/5/2020, Expert discovery to be completed by 7/22/2020, Dispositive motions and motions challenging experts due by 8/7/2020. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (MW)
|
September 27, 2019 |
Filing
89
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER per parties' 16 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
|
August 19, 2019 |
Filing
87
AGREEMENT REGARDING DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION AND ORDER per parties' 86 Stipulated Motion. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
|
February 13, 2019 |
Filing
73
ORDER re: parties' 72 Stipulated Motion to Vacate Deadline to File a Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan. Joint Status Report due by 4/1/2019. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
|
December 6, 2018 |
Filing
67
ORDER re: parties' 65 Stipulated Motion to Extend Certain Deadlines. Initial Disclosure Deadline extended to 12/20/2018, Combined Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 1/3/2019. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
|
November 1, 2018 |
Filing
44
STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Certain Deadlines re parties' 38 Stipulated Motion: FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/21/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/5/2018, Joint Status Report due by 12/12/2018, signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(SWT)
|
September 26, 2018 |
Filing
20
ORDER re: parties 19 Stipulated Motion to Extend Certain Deadlines. Service of Summons and Complaint on a Nonparty by Defendants extended to 10/1/2018; Service and Filing of an Amended Answer and Counterclaim by Defendants extended to 10/1/2018. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
|
August 29, 2018 |
Filing
17
STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Certain Deadlines re parties' 16 Stipulated MOTION. Service of Summons and Complaint on a Nonparty by Defendants is 9/26/2018, Service and Filing of an Amended Answer and Counterclaim by Defendants is 9/26/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/31/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/7/2018, Combined Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 10/31/2018. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (TH)
|
August 2, 2018 |
Filing
15
ORDER re the parties' 14 Stipulated Motion to Extend Certain Deadlines. Service of Summons and Complaint on a Nonparty by Defendants is 9/6/2018, Service and Filing of an Amended Answer and Counterclaim by Defendants is 9/6/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/20/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/27/2018, Combined Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 9/20/2018. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
|
July 23, 2018 |
Filing
11
ORDER granting 10 Stipulated Motion. Attorneys Arthur W. Harrigan, Jr,Tyler Lawrence Farmer and Kristin Elizabeth Ballinger are substituted as counsel for Defendants ORA Talus 90, LLC and Resmark Equity Partners; Attorney Christopher Ian Brain is withdrawn as counsel for Defendants. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
|
July 16, 2018 |
Filing
9
ORDER granting parties' 8 Stipulated Motion to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline; Defendants' deadline to file any responsive pleading is 7/30/2018, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
|