Nix v. Boddy et al

Plaintiff: Neiman Nix
Defendant: Kyle Boddy and Driveline Baseball Enterprises LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00992
Filed: June 29, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
0 Judge: Robert S Lasnik
1 Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2018 30 Featured Case ORDER directing the Clerk to TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington and mark this case as CLOSED in this District. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/29/2018. (ps1) [Transferred from flsd on 7/3/2018.]
June 28, 2018 29 Featured Case ORDER granting #27 #28 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Alex S. Hornik withdrawn from case. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/28/2018. (ps1) [Transferred from flsd on 7/3/2018.]
June 28, 2018 28 Plaintiff's MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff by Alex S. Hornik for / by Neiman Nix. Responses due by 7/12/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw)(Hornik, Alex) [Transferred from flsd on 7/3/2018.]
June 28, 2018 27 Plaintiff's MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff by Alex S. Hornik for / by Neiman Nix. Responses due by 7/12/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw)(Hornik, Alex) [Transferred from flsd on 7/3/2018.]
June 27, 2018 Set Deadlines Per DE#26. Responses due by 6/28/2018 Replies due by 7/5/2018. (cqs) [Transferred from flsd on 7/3/2018.]
June 27, 2018 26 Featured Case ORDER bifurcating #22 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice; Responses due by 6/28/2018, Replies due by 7/5/2018. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/27/2018. (ps1) [Transferred from flsd on 7/3/2018.]
June 25, 2018 25 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Motion Hearing held on 6/25/2018 re #22 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #13 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer, filed by Kyle Boddy, Driveline Baseball Enterprises, LLC. Total time in court: 0 hour(s) : 10 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Tyler C. Peterson, Sean Michael Cleary, Alex S. Hornik, Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ssi) [Transferred from flsd on 7/3/2018.]
June 22, 2018 24 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Status Conference re: #22 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #13 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer: Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 6/25/2018 01:15 PM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. The parties may appear by phone and are instructed to call 1-888-684-8852 on the date and time set forth above. The access code is 3156459 and the password is 5510. FOR CLARITY, PLEASE DO NOT USE A CELL PHONE OR A SPEAKER PHONE. (ps1) [Transferred from flsd on 7/3/2018.]
June 14, 2018 23 NOTICE by Kyle Boddy, Driveline Baseball Enterprises, LLC re #22 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #13 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer, (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Cleary, Sean) [Transferred from flsd on 7/3/2018.]
June 14, 2018 22 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #13 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer, by Kyle Boddy, Driveline Baseball Enterprises, LLC. Responses due by 6/28/2018 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Kyle Boddy, #2 Affidavit Declaration of James Michael Rathwell, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Cleary, Sean) [Transferred from flsd on 7/3/2018.]
June 8, 2018 21 Featured Case *ORDER ON MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 6/8/2018. (tb) [Transferred from flsd on 7/3/2018.]
June 8, 2018 20 Featured Case ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Jury Trial set for 2/19/2019 in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Calendar Call set for 2/12/2019 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 7/19/2018. Discovery, including Expert Discovery, due by 10/22/2018. Mediation Deadline 10/29/2018. All pre-trial and Daubert Motions due by 11/6/2018. Joint Pretrial Stipulation and In Limine Motions due by 12/4/2018. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/7/2018. (wc) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. [Transferred from flsd on 7/3/2018.]
June 7, 2018 19 NOTICE of Compliance with order dated June 6, 2018 by Neiman Nix re #18 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Neiman Nix, #17 Order to Show Cause (Hornik, Alex) [Transferred from flsd on 7/3/2018.]
June 7, 2018 18 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Neiman Nix (Hornik, Alex) [Transferred from flsd on 7/3/2018.]
June 6, 2018 17 Featured Case ORDER that Plaintiff shall comply with the #8 Order by 6/8/2018. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/6/2018. (ps1) [Transferred from flsd on 7/3/2018.]
June 5, 2018 16 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kyle Boddy, Driveline Baseball Enterprises, LLC identifying Other Affiliate James Michael Rathwell for Driveline Baseball Enterprises, LLC, Kyle Boddy (Cleary, Sean) [Transferred from flsd on 7/3/2018.]
June 5, 2018 15 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Kyle Boddy, Driveline Baseball Enterprises, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Cleary, Sean) [Transferred from flsd on 7/3/2018.]
June 4, 2018 14 STATUS REPORT Removal by Kyle Boddy, Driveline Baseball Enterprises, LLC (Cleary, Sean) [Transferred from flsd on 7/3/2018.]
May 30, 2018 13 Featured Case ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint; Defendants' Answer due 6/14/2018. Re: #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by Kyle Boddy, Driveline Baseball Enterprises, LLC. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/29/2018. (ps1) [Transferred from flsd on 7/3/2018.]
May 29, 2018 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Complaint by Kyle Boddy, Driveline Baseball Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cleary, Sean) [Transferred from flsd on 7/3/2018.]
May 29, 2018 11 NOTICE by Kyle Boddy, Driveline Baseball Enterprises, LLC re #10 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines of Filing Affidavit (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Cleary, Sean) [Transferred from flsd on 7/3/2018.]
May 25, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER that Defendants shall file an affidavit clarifying the citizenship of each of Drivelines members no later than 5/30/2018. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/25/2018. (ps1) [Transferred from flsd on 7/3/2018.]
May 24, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA) [Transferred from flsd on 7/3/2018.]
May 24, 2018 8 Featured Case Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties by 6/5/2018. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/24/2018. (ps1) [Transferred from flsd on 7/3/2018.]
May 24, 2018 7 Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases; Removal Status Report due by 6/4/2018. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/24/2018. (ps1) [Transferred from flsd on 7/3/2018.]
May 24, 2018 6 NOTICE by Kyle Boddy, Driveline Baseball Enterprises, LLC re #5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Tyler C. Peterson. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10680804 of Filing (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Cleary, Sean) [Transferred from flsd on 7/3/2018.]
May 24, 2018 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Tyler C. Peterson. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10680804 by Kyle Boddy, Driveline Baseball Enterprises, LLC. Responses due by 6/7/2018 (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Cleary, Sean) [Transferred from flsd on 7/3/2018.]
May 24, 2018 4 NOTICE by Kyle Boddy, Driveline Baseball Enterprises, LLC re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case of Filing (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cleary, Sean) [Transferred from flsd on 7/3/2018.]
May 24, 2018 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (lh) [Transferred from flsd on 7/3/2018.]
May 24, 2018 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (lh) [Transferred from flsd on 7/3/2018.]
May 24, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Verified Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10680279, filed by Driveline Baseball Enterprises, LLC, Kyle Boddy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A"/State Court Complaint and other documents, #2 Exhibit "B")(Cleary, Sean) Modified text on 5/24/2018 (lh). [Transferred from flsd on 7/3/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nix v. Boddy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neiman Nix
Represented By: Alex S. Hornik
Represented By: Lance D. Reich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Boddy
Represented By: Sean Michael Cleary
Represented By: Tyler C Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Driveline Baseball Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Sean Michael Cleary
Represented By: Tyler C Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?