Green Fitness Equipment Company, LLC v. Precor Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Green Fitness Equipment Company, LLC
Defendant: 24 Hour Fitness USA Inc and Precor Inc
Intervenor Plaintiff: David Morris
Case Number: 2:2018cv00993
Filed: June 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2018 case electronically transmitted to the Western District of Washington. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2018) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #46 Motion to Transfer Case. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2018) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
June 28, 2018 Filing 58 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon S. Tigar: Motion Hearing held on 6/28/2018 re #46 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by 24 Hour Fitness USA Inc, Precor Inc. Total Time in Court: 29 minutes. Court Reporter: Vicki Eastvold. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/28/2018) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO INTERVENE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; denying #33 Motion to Intervene. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2018) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
June 6, 2018 Filing 56 Declaration of Jeffrey A. Key in response to plaintiffs opposition to defendants motion to transfer filed by24 Hour Fitness USA Inc, Precor Inc.. (Wong, Eric) (Filed on 6/6/2018) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
June 6, 2018 Filing 55 REPLY (re #46 MOTION to Transfer Case, or Dismiss Due to Improper Venue filed by 24 Hour Fitness USA Inc, Precor Inc.. (Wong, Eric) (Filed on 6/6/2018) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
May 30, 2018 Filing 54 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #46 Joint MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Case) filed by Green Fitness Equipment Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Cody R. LeJeune In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C)(LeJeune, Cody) (Filed on 5/30/2018) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
May 23, 2018 Filing 53 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/30/2018 is continued to 8/1/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. A Joint Case Management Statement is due by 7/23/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2018) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
May 21, 2018 Filing 52 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Green Fitness Equipment Company, LLC. (Coddington, Trevor) (Filed on 5/21/2018) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 51 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by 24 Hour Fitness USA Inc identifying Corporate Parent 24 Hour Fitness United States, Inc. for 24 Hour Fitness USA Inc. (Wong, Eric) (Filed on 5/17/2018) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 50 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Precor Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Amer Sports Company for Precor Inc.. (Wong, Eric) (Filed on 5/17/2018) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 49 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to #46 MOTION to Transfer Case. This motion has been noticed for hearing on a date when the Court is not available. The motion hearing is continued to 6/28/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. The briefing schedule remains as originally set. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2018) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 48 [Proposed] Order Granting re #46 JOINT MOTION to Transfer or Dismiss Due to Improper Venue filed by 24 Hour Fitness USA Inc, Precor Inc.. (Wong, Eric) (Filed on 5/16/2018) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 47 Declaration of Jack Trummer in Support of #46 MOTION to Transfer or Dismiss Due to Improper Venue filed by 24 Hour Fitness USA Inc, Precor Inc.. (Related document(s) #46 ) (Wong, Eric) (Filed on 5/16/2018) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 46 JOINT MOTION to Transfer or Dismiss Due to Improper Venue filed by 24 Hour Fitness USA Inc, Precor Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 5/30/2018. Replies due by 6/6/2018. (Wong, Eric) (Filed on 5/16/2018) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
May 15, 2018 Filing 45 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Green Fitness Equipment Company, LLC (Samporna, Donny) (Filed on 5/15/2018) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
May 15, 2018 Filing 44 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 5/15/2018 by Tamara Lange. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
May 10, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) - CORRECTION OF DOCKET #40 (Samporna, Donny) (Filed on 5/10/2018) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
May 10, 2018 Filing 42 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options - CORRECTION OF DOCKET #39 (Samporna, Donny) (Filed on 5/10/2018) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
May 9, 2018 Filing 41 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 5/15/2018 at 11:30 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2018) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
May 9, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Samporna, Donny) (Filed on 5/9/2018) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
May 9, 2018 Filing 39 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Samporna, Donny) (Filed on 5/9/2018) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER VACATING HEARING re #33 First MOTION to Intervene filed by David Morris. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 12, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2018) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
March 21, 2018 Filing 37 REPLY (re #33 MOTION for Leave to Intervene) - Reply to Opposition to Motion for Leave to Intervene filed by David Morris. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Khashayar, Daryoosh) (Filed on 3/21/2018) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
March 14, 2018 Filing 36 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #33 First MOTION to Intervene ) filed by Green Fitness Equipment Company, LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration Justin Hai, #(2) Declaration Trevor Coddington, #(3) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Coddington, Trevor) (Filed on 3/14/2018) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
March 14, 2018 Filing 35 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #33 First MOTION to Intervene) - Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Intervene filed by 24 Hour Fitness USA Inc, Precor Inc.. (Wong, Eric) (Filed on 3/14/2018) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
February 28, 2018 Filing 34 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to #33 MOTION to Intervene. This Motion has been noticed for hearing on a date less than 35 days after the filing date (Civil L.R. 7-2(a)) and on a date closed to further settings. The hearing is continued to 4/19/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. No other deadlines are changed by this Notice. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2018) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
February 28, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION to Intervene filed by David Morris. Motion Hearing set for 3/29/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 3/14/2018. Replies due by 3/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Complaint In Intervention of Plaintiff for David Morris, #2 Declaration Plaintiff-Intervenor David Morris's Memo In Support of Motion for Leave to Intervene, #3 Declaration Dec of David Morris In Support of Motion to Intervene, #4 Declaration Dec of Daryoosh Khashsayar in Support of Motion to Intervene, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Davis Morris;s Motion to Intervene, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Khashayar, Daryoosh) (Filed on 2/28/2018) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
February 23, 2018 Filing 32 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 5/21/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/30/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2018) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/22/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2018) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
February 22, 2018 Filing 30 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2018) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
February 21, 2018 Filing 29 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Green Fitness Equipment Company, LLC.. (Samporna, Donny) (Filed on 2/21/2018) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
February 21, 2018 Filing 28 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by 24 Hour Fitness USA Inc, Precor Inc... (Wong, Eric) (Filed on 2/21/2018) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
February 21, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Sean Wong (Wong, Eric) (Filed on 2/21/2018) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
February 8, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Donny K. Samporna (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Samporna, Donny) (Filed on 2/8/2018) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
February 8, 2018 Filing 25 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/3/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/10/2018 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2018) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
February 7, 2018 Filing 24 Case transferred in from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:17-cv-00245. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 2/8/2018 (fabS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
January 31, 2018 Filing 23 Case transferred to District of Northern District of California. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Northern District of California*.*450 GOLDEN GATE AVENUE, BOX 36060**SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94102-3489*. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 1/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Order) (anh) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
January 30, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel - David Beckwith by Green Fitness Equipment Company, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Beckwith, David) (anh). [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
January 25, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Cody R. LeJeune on behalf of Green Fitness Equipment Company, LLC (LeJeune, Cody)Attorney Cody R. LeJeune added to party Green Fitness Equipment Company, LLC(pty:pla) (anh). [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
November 3, 2017 Filing 20 NOTICE of Filing of Inter Parties Review Petition Challenging the Asserted Claims of the Patent in Suit by 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc., Precor Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David J. Aveni, #2 Exhibit A and B, #3 Proof of Service)(Aveni, David) (knb). [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
June 28, 2017 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File a Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, Transfer for Improper Venue filed by Green Fitness Equipment Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Trevor Coddington, #2 Proof of Service)(Coddington, Trevor)(knb). [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
June 26, 2017 Filing 18 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File a Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, Transfer for Improper Venue by Precor Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Declaration of David J. Aveni, #7 Proof of Service)(Key, Jeffery) (knb). [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
April 26, 2017 Filing 17 Minute Order issued by the Honorable Roger T. Benitez: Submitting #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Court to issue written Order. Motion Hearing date of 5/1/2017 10:30AM is hereby vacated. (no document attached) (gxr) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
April 24, 2017 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc., Precor Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Aveni, David) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
April 17, 2017 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Green Fitness Equipment Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Beckwith, David) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
March 24, 2017 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc., Precor Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Aveni, David) (fth). [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
March 23, 2017 Filing 13 PRO HAC APPROVED: Jeffery A Key appearing for Defendant Precor Inc.(no document attached)(jrd) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
March 22, 2017 Filing 12 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-9922800.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Key, Jeffery)(jrd) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #10 Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint. 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc. answer due 3/24/2017; Precor Inc. answer due 3/24/2017. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 3/6/2017. (jjg) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
March 3, 2017 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint by 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc., Precor Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David J. Aveni, #2 Proof of Service)(Aveni, David)Attorney David Joseph Aveni added to party 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David Joseph Aveni added to party Precor Inc.(pty:dft) (knb). [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
February 16, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Beckwith on behalf of Green Fitness Equipment Company, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Beckwith, David)Attorney David Michael Beckwith added to party Green Fitness Equipment Company, LLC(pty:pla) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
February 13, 2017 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Green Fitness Equipment Company, LLC. 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc. served. (Coddington, Trevor) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
February 13, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by James V Fazio, III on behalf of Green Fitness Equipment Company, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Fazio, James)Attorney James V Fazio, III added to party Green Fitness Equipment Company, LLC(pty:pla) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
February 11, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Green Fitness Equipment Company, LLC . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Coddington, Trevor) (knb). [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
February 11, 2017 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Green Fitness Equipment Company, LLC. Precor Inc. served. (Coddington, Trevor) (knb). [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
February 8, 2017 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia has declined assignment pursuant to General Order 598. Case reassigned to Judge Roger T. Benitez for all further proceedings. The new case number is 17cv245 BEN (KSC).(no document attached) (jcj) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
February 8, 2017 Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (lrf) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
February 8, 2017 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *8,884,553*, *9,430,920* cc:USPTO (lrf) [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]
February 8, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc. & Precor Inc., (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0974-9799490), filed by Green Fitness Equipment Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)The new case number is 3:17-cv-245-AJB-KSC. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Coddington, Trevor)(lrf) (sjt). [Transferred from cand on 7/5/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green Fitness Equipment Company, LLC v. Precor Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Fitness Equipment Company, LLC
Represented By: David M. Beckwith
Represented By: Trevor Quick Coddington
Represented By: Donny K. Samporna
Represented By: James Vincent Fazio, III
Represented By: Cody R. LeJeune
Represented By: Vanessa L Wheeler
Represented By: Kent Michael Fandel
Represented By: James V Fazio, III
Represented By: Daniel J. Oates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: David Morris
Represented By: Daryoosh Khashayar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 24 Hour Fitness USA Inc
Represented By: Jeffery A Key
Represented By: David Joseph Aveni
Represented By: Eric Sean Wong
Represented By: Brian C Park
Represented By: James M Shore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precor Inc
Represented By: Jeffery A Key
Represented By: David Joseph Aveni
Represented By: Eric Sean Wong
Represented By: Brian C Park
Represented By: James M Shore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?