Loops, LLC et al v. Bob Barker Company et al
Plaintiff: Loops, LLC and Loops Flexbrush, LLC
Defendant: Does 1-10, Maxill, Inc and Bob Barker Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv01026
Filed: July 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Whatcom
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Referring Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2018 Filing 75 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from District of District of Utah and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (ST)
July 5, 2018 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (ST)
July 5, 2018 Filing 74 Report on the Final Decision in this court of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office (alt) (Report posted by WAWD clerk exactly as it appeared on the District of Utah's docket report as it did not transfer over with the rest of the documents) (ST) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
July 5, 2018 Filing 73 Case transferred in from District of Utah, Case Number 1:17-cv-00123.
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #71 Motion to Change Venue; withdrawing #34 Motion to Dismiss: this action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 7/5/18 (alt) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
July 3, 2018 Filing 71 Stipulated MOTION to Change Venue and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Loops, Loops Flexbrush. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Brooke C. Wells.(Walker, Kent) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #69 Motion to Dismiss Party, Bob Barker Company, with prejudice. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 6/15/18 (alt) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 69 Consent MOTION to Dismiss Party Bob Barker Company, Inc. filed by Plaintiffs Loops, Loops Flexbrush. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Kent) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #67 Motion to Withdraw, withdrawing #63 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 6/7/18 (alt) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
June 7, 2018 Filing 67 MOTION to Withdraw #63 MOTION to Compel Maxill, Inc. to Produce an Unredacted Version of its Initial Contentions and Accompanying Documents and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Bob Barker Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Brooke C. Wells.(Watson, James) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
March 16, 2018 Filing 66 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #63 MOTION to Compel Maxill, Inc. to Produce an Unredacted Version of its Initial Contentions and Accompanying Documents and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Loops, Loops Flexbrush. (Walker, Kent) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
March 16, 2018 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by James C. Watson on behalf of Bob Barker Company (Watson, James) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
March 13, 2018 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by James C. Watson on behalf of Bob Barker Company (Watson, James) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
March 9, 2018 Filing 63 MOTION to Compel Maxill, Inc. to Produce an Unredacted Version of its Initial Contentions and Accompanying Documents and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Bob Barker Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Maxill's Initial Non-Infringement and Invalidity Contentions, #2 Exhibit B - Email thread, #3 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Brooke C. Wells.(Burton, H.) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
March 8, 2018 Filing 62 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re 57 Sealed Document,, #61 Reply Memorandum/Reply to Response to Motion, #55 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, #34 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Maxill. (Kakar, Mudit) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
February 1, 2018 Filing 61 Defendant's REPLY to Response to Motion re #34 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Maxill. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Mudit Kakar, #2 Exhibit Exhibit to Declaration of Mudit Kakar)(Kakar, Mudit) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #56 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document re #55 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 1/22/18 (alt) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
January 22, 2018 Modification of Docket re 57 Sealed Document. Error: Sealed document was not linked to underlying motion being briefed. Correction: Added link to underlying #34 Motion to Dismss. (alt) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
January 19, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE OF ERROR re #55 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. The document was filed without the word "Redacted" added to the entry. The clerk has added the word to the beginning of the entry, but reminds all filers to remember to mark redacted filings as such in the future. (alt) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. Motion referred to Brooke C. Wells. So ordered by Judge David Nuffer on 1/19/18 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
January 17, 2018 Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document re #55 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Plaintiffs Loops, Loops Flexbrush. (Nadesan, Karthik) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
January 17, 2018 Filing 55 Redacted MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #34 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Loops, Loops Flexbrush. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1, #2 Appendix 2, #3 Affidavit of Wagner, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Affidavit of Walker, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit J, #15 Exhibit K, #16 Exhibit L, #17 Exhibit M, #18 Exhibit N)(Walker, Kent) Modified on 1/19/2018: added "Redacted" to entry (alt) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 PATENT CASE SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference vacated. Amended Pleadings due by 3/26/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 3/26/2018. Plaintiff is directed to file a new scheduling order within 14 days of ruling on claim construction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 12/11/2017. (jds) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting #42 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #34 MOTION to Dismiss (Response due by 1/17/2018); denying #50 Motion to Strike Exhibit E to #49 Reply. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 12/8/17 (alt) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
December 7, 2017 Filing 52 REPLY to Response to Motion re #50 MOTION to Strike #49 Reply Memorandum/Reply to Response to Motion, and Memorandum in Support Exhibit E to Affidavit of Walker filed by Defendant Maxill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B-1, #4 Exhibit B-2, #5 Exhibit B-3, #6 Exhibit B-4, #7 Exhibit B-5, #8 Exhibit B-6, #9 Exhibit B-7, #10 Affidavit Declaration of Kakar)(Kakar, Mudit) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
December 6, 2017 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #50 MOTION to Strike #49 Reply Memorandum/Reply to Response to Motion, and Memorandum in Support Exhibit E to Affidavit of Walker filed by Plaintiffs Loops, Loops Flexbrush. (Walker, Kent) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
December 6, 2017 Filing 50 MOTION to Strike #49 Reply Memorandum/Reply to Response to Motion, and Memorandum in Support Exhibit E to Affidavit of Walker filed by Defendant Maxill. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of John Shaw, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of John Shaw, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of John Shaw, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Kakar, Mudit) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
December 5, 2017 Filing 49 REPLY to Response to Motion re #42 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #34 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Ruling filed by Plaintiffs Loops, Loops Flexbrush. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Wagner, #2 Exhibit A to Wagner Decl, #3 Exhibit B to Wagner Decl, #4 Exhibit C to Wagner Decl, #5 Affidavit of Walker, #6 Exhibit E)(Walker, Kent) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
December 1, 2017 Filing 48 RESPONSE to Motion re #42 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #34 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Ruling filed by Defendant Maxill. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Mudit Kakar In Support of Maxill Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time, #2 Affidavit Declaration of John Shaw In Support of Maxill Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Sharon Van Doesburg In Support of Maxill Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time, #4 Text of Proposed Order on Motion for Extension of Deadline to Respond to Motion to Dismiss)(Benevento, Bryon) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
December 1, 2017 Filing 47 RESPONSE to Motion re #42 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #34 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Ruling filed by Defendant Bob Barker Company. (Kalish, David) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
November 30, 2017 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #33 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Loops, Loops Flexbrush. (Walker, Kent) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #41 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mudit Kakar for Maxill. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov So ordered by Judge David Nuffer on 11/29/17 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 DOCKET TEXT ORDER taking under advisement #42 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response; granting #42 Motion to Expedite. Plaintiff's opposition to the Motion to Dismiss is currently due December 6, 2017. Plaintiff seeks a 45-day extension to afford time for further jurisdictional discovery. Briefing on the Motion for Extension will be expedited. Defendants' response is due December 1, 2017 at 2:00 PM. Plaintiff's reply is due December 5, 2017 at 2:00 PM. In the event the Motion for Extension is denied, Plaintiff's response to the Motion to Dismiss will be accepted as timely within 7 days of a decision from the court on the Motion for Extension. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on November 29, 2017. No attached document. (mjt) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
November 28, 2017 Filing 43 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Kent M. Walker in Support re #42 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #34 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Ruling filed by Plaintiffs Loops, Loops Flexbrush. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: First Set of Interrogatories to Maxill, #2 Exhibit B: First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Maxill, #3 Exhibit C: First Set of Interrogatories to BBC, #4 Exhibit D: First Set of Interrogatories to BBC, #5 Exhibit E: Notice of Deposition of Maxill, #6 Exhibit F: Notice of Deposition of BBC)(Nadesan, Karthik) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
November 28, 2017 Filing 42 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #34 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support , MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Ruling filed by Plaintiffs Loops, Loops Flexbrush. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Motion to Expedite, #2 Text of Proposed Order on Motion for Extension)(Nadesan, Karthik) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
November 27, 2017 Filing 41 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mudit Kakar , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-2889085, filed by Defendant Maxill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Benevento, Bryon) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
November 22, 2017 Filing 40 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL of Zachary W. Derr filed by Zachary W. Derr on behalf of Maxill (Derr, Zachary) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
November 22, 2017 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Neville on behalf of Maxill (Neville, Kimberly) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
November 22, 2017 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryon J. Benevento on behalf of Maxill (Benevento, Bryon) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
November 22, 2017 Filing 37 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Walker, Kent) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
November 9, 2017 Filing 36 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Bob Barker Company identifying Bob Barker, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Burton, H.) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
November 8, 2017 Filing 35 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Maxill re #34 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support (Derr, Zachary) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
November 8, 2017 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Maxill. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Shaw in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Derr, Zachary) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
November 2, 2017 Filing 33 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Bob Barker Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burton, H.) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #7 Amended Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Maxill - answer due 11/8/2017. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 11/2/17 (alt) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
November 1, 2017 Filing 31 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Maxill. (Derr, Zachary) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
October 30, 2017 Filing 30 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to the case. (jwt) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
October 30, 2017 Filing 29 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Bob Barker Company. (jwt) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David E. Bennett for Bob Barker Company. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 10/18/2017. (las) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Anthony J. Biller for Bob Barker Company. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Paul M. Warner on 10/17/2017. (las) Modified on 10/18/2017 by correcting the name to the Judge that signed the order. (las). [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David D. Kalish for Bob Barker Company. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 10/18/2017. (las) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
October 17, 2017 Filing 25 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiffs Loops, Loops Flexbrush. (las) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
October 16, 2017 Filing 24 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of DAVID E. BENNETT , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-2863473, filed by Defendant Bob Barker Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for PHV, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Registration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Burton, H.) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
October 16, 2017 Filing 23 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of ANTHONY J. BILLER , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-2863467, filed by Defendant Bob Barker Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Registration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Burton, H.) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
October 16, 2017 Filing 22 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of DAVID D. KALISH , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-2863454, filed by Defendant Bob Barker Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for PHV, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Registration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Burton, H.) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
October 13, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: (Notice generated by IPT Clerk)The Attorneys Planning Meeting Report and Proposed Scheduling Order forms, available on the court web site at # http://www.utd.uscourts.gov/usdc-forms, should be prepared 21 days before the Initial Pretrial Conference hearing date.NOTICE TO COUNSEL, The Court may enter a scheduling order and vacate the hearing if counsel(a) file a stipulated Attorneys Planning Meeting Report; and(b) e-mail a Proposed Scheduling Order to #ipt@utd.uscourts.gov21 days before the scheduled hearing. See instructions at # http://www.utd.uscourts.gov/attorney-planning-meeting-and-reportIf counsel or the parties would like to participate by phone they must contact the IPT Clerk at least two days in advance at #ipt@utd.uscourts.gov to make arrangements. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/13/2017 at 11:00 AM in Rm 8.400 before Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. (jds) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
October 13, 2017 Filing 20 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Maxill. (las) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
October 12, 2017 Filing 19 NOTICE FROM THE COURT re: Initial SchedulingThe court's IPT Clerk will now set the case for the Initial Pretrial Scheduling Conference (las) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
October 12, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Bob Barker Company, Maxill, Plaintiffs Loops, Loops Flexbrush. (las) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
October 12, 2017 Filing 17 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Bob Barker Company, Maxill, Plaintiffs Loops, Loops Flexbrush. Form due by 10/27/2017. (las) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
October 6, 2017 ANSWER DEADLINE UPDATED for Bob Barker Company answer due 11/2/2017. (kpf) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Defendants Bob Barker Company Inc.and Maxill, Inc. to respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint is extended to November 2, 1017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 10/06/2017. (kpf) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
October 5, 2017 Filing 15 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time filing an answer filed by Defendant Maxill. (Derr, Zachary) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
October 5, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary W. Derr on behalf of Maxill (Derr, Zachary) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #7 Amended Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Bob Barker Company answer due 10/22/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 10/2/2017. (las) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
September 29, 2017 Filing 12 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #7 Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Bob Barker Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney H. Dickson Burton added to party Bob Barker Company(pty:dft)(Burton, H.) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
September 25, 2017 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for Summons; First Amended Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Corporate Disclosure Statement served on Maxill Inc. on September 20, 2017, filed by Plaintiffs Loops, Loops Flexbrush. (Walker, Kent) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
September 25, 2017 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for Summons; First Amended Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Corporate Disclosure Statement served on Bob Barker Company, Inc. on 09/11/2017, filed by Plaintiffs Loops, Loops Flexbrush. (Walker, Kent) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
September 7, 2017 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. New Defendants: Maxill Inc.. filed by Loops, Loops Flexbrush. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: US Patent 8,448,285) (Nadesan, Karthik) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kent M. Walker for Loops,Kent M. Walker for Loops Flexbrush. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 7/21/2017. (las) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
July 20, 2017 Filing 5 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (tlh) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
July 20, 2017 Filing 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kent M. Walker , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-2803108, filed by Plaintiffs Loops, Loops Flexbrush. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nadesan, Karthik) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
July 20, 2017 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiffs Loops, Loops Flexbrush. (Nadesan, Karthik) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
July 20, 2017 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-2803026) filed by Loops, Loops Flexbrush. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: US Patent 8,448,285, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Nadesan, Karthik) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]
July 20, 2017 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Plaintiffs Loops, Loops Flexbrush is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh) [Transferred from utd on 7/12/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loops, LLC et al v. Bob Barker Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxill, Inc
Represented By: Zachary W. Derr
Represented By: Kimberly Neville
Represented By: Bryon J. Benevento
Represented By: Mudit Kakar
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Barker Company
Represented By: Anthony J. Biller
Represented By: H Dickson Burton
Represented By: David D. Kalish
Represented By: David E. Bennett
Represented By: James C. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loops, LLC
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Represented By: Karthik Nadesan
Represented By: Kent M Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loops Flexbrush, LLC
Represented By: Karthik Nadesan
Represented By: Kent M Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?