Guo v. United States of America

Petitioner: Yong Guo
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2018cv01055
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2018 16 REQUEST for United States to Serve Petitioner Documents Sent to Court; filed by Petitioner Yong Guo (SWT)
August 29, 2018 Noting Date Set for Govt's #15 Response to 2255 Petition : Noting Date 9/21/2018, per #5 Order. (PM) cc: NEF and copy of docket report sent to Petitioner via first Class mail
August 28, 2018 15 RESPONSE, by Respondent United States of America, to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Greenberg, Todd) (PM).
August 16, 2018 14 EXHIBITS: Petitioner's Discovered Discrepancies Among the DHS Evidentiary Submissions to the Court Dated 6/6/2018, filed by Petitioner Yong Guo (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SWT)
August 16, 2018 13 MOTION for Reconsideration re #10 Order on Motion for TRO, filed by Petitioner Yong Guo. Noted by Clerk for 8/16/2018, (SWT)
August 16, 2018 12 MOTION for Reconsideration re #9 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, filed by Petitioner Yong Guo. Noted by Clerk for 8/16/2018, (SWT)
August 16, 2018 11 MOTION to Order US to Surrender Critical Evidence and Partial Evidential Submissions, filed by Petitioner Yong Guo. Noted by Clerk for 8/31/2018, (SWT)
August 9, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER denying Petitioner's #8 Motion for Emergency Protective Order and Temporary Restraining Order, signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SWT) (cc: Petitioner via USPS)
August 9, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER denying Petitioner's #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SWT) (cc: Petitioner via USPS)
August 8, 2018 8 MOTION for Emergency Protective Order and Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Petitioner Yong Guo. Noted by Clerk for 8/8/2018, (SWT)
August 1, 2018 7 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying as moot Petitioner's #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: petitioner via first class mail
July 23, 2018 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Yong Guo. (PM)
July 19, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER DIRECTING THE UNITED STATES TO ANSWER 2255 PETITION #1 ; Answer due within 45 days of this Order. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: Petitioner via first class mail
July 18, 2018 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (SG)
July 16, 2018 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Petitioner Yong Guo. (SG)
July 16, 2018 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255), related to criminal case: 15-CR-000023-MJP., filed by Yong Guo.(SG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guo v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Yong Guo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Todd Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?